Richmond et al v. Weise et al
Plaintiff: Courtney Richmond and Chef Courtney's Homemade BBQ Sauce
Defendant: Nolan Weise, Backyard Specialty Foods and Minnehaha Court Clerks Office of Civil
Case Number: 4:2023cv04168
Filed: October 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2023 Filing 33 BRIEF in Support re #23 MOTION for Leave to Second Motion to Proceed and Set Case for Jury Trial by Plaintiffs Courtney Richmond and Chef Courtney's Homemade BBQ Sauce (MSB)
December 8, 2023 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #26 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Courtney Richmond. (MSB)
December 6, 2023 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Support re #30 MOTION for Hearing re #23 MOTION for Leave to Second Motion to Proceed and Set Case for Jury Trial, #18 MOTION to Proceed to Jury Trial, #19 Miscellaneous Submission, #16 Response to Motion filed by Backyard Specialty Foods, Nolan Weise. (Williamson, Hilary)
December 6, 2023 Filing 30 MOTION for Hearing re #23 MOTION for Leave to Second Motion to Proceed and Set Case for Jury Trial, #18 MOTION to Proceed to Jury Trial, #19 Miscellaneous Submission, #16 Response to Motion by Backyard Specialty Foods, Nolan Weise. (Williamson, Hilary)
December 6, 2023 Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re #23 MOTION for Leave to Second Motion to Proceed and Set Case for Jury Trial filed by Backyard Specialty Foods, Nolan Weise. (Williamson, Hilary)
December 6, 2023 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION to Proceed to Jury Trial filed by Backyard Specialty Foods, Nolan Weise. (Williamson, Hilary)
December 5, 2023 Filing 27 Clerk's DENIAL of Default as to Backyard Specialty Foods, Minnehaha Court Clerks Office of Civil, Nolan Weise. (MWT)
December 4, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION for Default Judgment on or After 30 Days by Courtney Richmond. (MSB)
December 4, 2023 Filing 25 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Backyard Specialty Foods. (Williamson, Hilary)
December 4, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE (Corporate Disclosure Statement not filed). D.S.D. Civ. L.R. 7.1.1 requires non-governmental organizational parties or intervenors to file either a Corporate Disclosure Statement or a Certificate that Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 is not applicable within 14 days of the party or intervenors first pleading or entry of appearance. The deadline has passed and Backyard Specialty Foods has not complied. Said party has three business days to comply. Compliance may be achieved by docketing the statement or certificate in CM/ECF using the Corporate Disclosure Statement or Certificate of Non-Applicability event. (RRB)
November 27, 2023 Filing 23 Second MOTION to Proceed and Set Case for Jury Trial by Courtney Richmond. (MSB)
November 27, 2023 Filing 22 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Minnehaha Court Clerks Office of Civil served on Angela Gries (Criminal Clerk of Courts Supervisor) November 20, 2023. (MSB)
November 20, 2023 Filing 21 BRIEF by Defendant Nolan Weise re #20 Second MOTION to DISMISS (Williamson, Hilary)
November 20, 2023 Filing 20 Second MOTION to DISMISS by Nolan Weise. (Williamson, Hilary)
November 20, 2023 Filing 19 Demand for Return of all Recipe Information by Courtney Richmond et al. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Agreement) (MSB)
November 20, 2023 Filing 18 Response and MOTION to Proceed to Jury Trial by Chef Courtney's Homemade BBQ Sauce, Courtney Richmond. (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Documents) (MSB)
November 17, 2023 Filing 17 REGISTRATION for Electronic Notice by Courtney Richmond. Pro se party Courtney Richmond will now receive electronic notice of unsealed documents filed in this case. Refer to the CM/ECF User Manual located on the court website at www.sdd.uscourts.gov for information about accessing documents. (MSB)
November 17, 2023 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motions filed by Courtney Richmond. (Attachments: #1 Service Receipt) (MSB) Best scan (MSB).
November 14, 2023 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand filed by Courtney Richmond. (the Clerk's Office mailed Mr. Richmond a Pro Se Litigant Registration Form for Electronic Notice per his request on page 6 of 6.) (JLS)
November 9, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Theobald on behalf of Minnehaha Court Clerks Office of Civil. (Theobald, Ashley)
November 8, 2023 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Minnehaha Court Clerks Office of Civil. (Anderson, Robert)
November 8, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim by Minnehaha Court Clerks Office of Civil. (Anderson, Robert)
November 8, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Anderson on behalf of Minnehaha Court Clerks Office of Civil. (Anderson, Robert)
November 3, 2023 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #8 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction and Res Judicata filed by Backyard Specialty Foods, Nolan Weise. (Attachments: #1 1 - 5/30/17 (1st Federal) Complaint, #2 2 - 7/17/17 (1st Federal) Dismissal, #3 3 - 4/7/21 (1st Federal) Motion Reopen, #4 Exhibit 4 - 4/14/21 (1st Federal) Dismissal, #5 Exhibit 5 - 7/30/19 (Lincoln Co.) Statement Small Claims, #6 Exhibit 6 - 2/13/20 (Lincoln Co.) Dismissal, #7 Exhibit 7 - 2/13/20 (Lincoln Co.) Motion Reopen, #8 Exhibit 8 - 2/19/20 (Lincoln Co.) Dismissal, #9 Exhibit 9 - 2/25/20 (1st Minnehaha Co.) Complaint, #10 Exhibit 10 - 3/4/20 (1st Minnehaha Co.) Amend Complaint, #11 Exhibit 11 - 12/28/20 (1st Minnehaha Co.) Dismissal, #12 Exhibit 12 - 12/29/20 (1st Minnehaha Co.) Judgment, #13 Exhibit 13 - 5/17/21 (South Dakota Supreme Court) Dismiss Appeal, #14 Exhibit 14 - 7/28/21 (South Dakota Supreme Court) Dismiss Appeal, #15 Exhibit 15 - 2/9/21 (2nd Minnehaha Co.) Complaint, #16 Exhibit 16 - 5/10/21 (2nd Minnehaha Co.) Dismissal, #17 Exhibit 17 - 5/12/21 (2nd Minnehaha Co.) Motion Set Aside, #18 Exhibit 18 - 4/21/21 (2nd Federal) Complaint, #19 Exhibit 19 - 6/14/21 (2nd Federal) Dismissal, #20 Exhibit 20 - 2/2/22 (Eighth Circuit) Dismiss Appeal, #21 Exhibit 21 - 10/25/23 (2nd Federal) Dismissal) (Williamson, Hilary)
November 3, 2023 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction and Res Judicata filed by Backyard Specialty Foods, Nolan Weise. (Williamson, Hilary)
November 3, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction and Res Judicata by Backyard Specialty Foods, Nolan Weise. (Williamson, Hilary)
November 3, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Hilary L. Williamson on behalf of Backyard Specialty Foods, Nolan Weise. (Williamson, Hilary)
November 3, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew T. Fick on behalf of Backyard Specialty Foods, Nolan Weise. (Fick, Andrew)
October 30, 2023 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Nolan Weise served on 10/25/2023. (MSB)
October 30, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Courtney Richmond. Minnehaha Court Clerks Office of Civil served on 10/19/2023, answer due 11/9/2023. (MSB)
October 19, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Minnehaha Court Clerks Office of Civil and Nolan Weise. 2 Summons(es) delivered via hand delivery to Pro Se Plaintiff with blank AO85 forms. (MSB)
October 18, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Complaint together with the filing fee and no summons(es). A new case has been opened. We are unable to issue summon(es) at this time. Enclosed is 3 blank summons forms and a sample completed summons form. Follow the enclosed instructions to properly to complete your summons(es). As soon as the Clerks Office receives your properly completed summons(es), they will be issued. Copy of docket sheet, blank summons form, and sample completed summons form with instructions sent to plaintiff. Pro Se Litigant Registration Form for Electronic Notice also sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Pursuant to the E-Government Act and D.S.D. Civ. LR 5.2, you must redact personal identifiers from documents submitted to the Court. The Clerks Office will not review for compliance. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. A request to electronically file documents in your case must be made through the PACER Service Center at www.pacer.uscourts.gov. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed of the plaintiff's address changes, including changes to primary and secondary email addresses. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (MSB)
October 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402.00 fee paid, receipt# 400002562, filed by Courtney Richmond, Chef Courtney's Homemade BBQ Sauce. (Attachments: #1 Support Documents) (MSB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richmond et al v. Weise et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chef Courtney's Homemade BBQ Sauce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nolan Weise
Represented By: Andrew T. Fick
Represented By: Hilary L. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Backyard Specialty Foods
Represented By: Andrew T. Fick
Represented By: Hilary L. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnehaha Court Clerks Office of Civil
Represented By: Ashley Theobald
Represented By: Robert B. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?