Hamrick et al v. AO Express, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Hamrick, Tiffany Hamrick and Dietrich Hamrick
Defendant: AO Express, LLC, Yopo Expedite, Inc. doing business as AO Express, LLC, Trigg Freight, Inc., John Wiebe, GDT Enterprises, LTD, Laurence Kroeker and State Farm Insurance Company doing business as State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Cross Claimant: Abdinasir Omar and Yopo Expedite, Inc.
Cross Defendant: State Farm Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2023cv04197
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 01/17/2024. (MSB)
January 16, 2024 Filing 35 REPLY to #28 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, filed by State Farm Insurance Company. (Beck, Molly)
January 16, 2024 Filing 34 [FILED IN ERROR] REPLY to #28 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, filed by State Farm Insurance Company. (Nelsen, Derek) Modified on 1/16/2024 to add text (KLE).
January 16, 2024 Filing 33 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by GDT Enterprises, LTD. (Meshbesher, Brandon)
January 16, 2024 Filing 32 ANSWER to #28 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, of Yopo Expedite, Inc. and Abdinasir Omar by GDT Enterprises, LTD, Laurence Kroeker. (Meshbesher, Brandon)
January 16, 2024 NOTICE of Filing Error: #34 Reply was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Beck, Molly)
January 5, 2024 Filing 31 NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE (Corporate Disclosure Statement not filed). D.S.D. Civ. L.R. 7.1.1 requires non-governmental organizational parties or intervenors to file either a Corporate Disclosure Statement or a Certificate that Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 is not applicable within 14 days of the party or intervenors first pleading or entry of appearance. The deadline has passed and GDT Enterprises, LTD has not complied. Said party has three business days to comply. Compliance may be achieved by docketing the statement or certificate in CM/ECF using the Corporate Disclosure Statement or Certificate of Non-Applicability event. (RRB)
January 3, 2024 Filing 30 REPLY to #10 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Abdinasir Omar, Yopo Expedite, Inc.. (Travis, Richard)
December 29, 2023 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dietrich Hamrick, Ryan Hamrick, Tiffany Hamrick. Laurence Kroeker served on 12/20/2023, answer due 1/10/2024. (Lanham, Kimberly)
December 28, 2023 Filing 28 Seperate ANSWER to #1 with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against GDT Enterprises, LTD, Laurence Kroeker, State Farm Insurance Company, Trigg Freight, Inc., John Wiebe by Yopo Expedite, Inc., Abdinasir Omar. (Travis, Richard)
December 28, 2023 NOTICE of Filing Error: #27 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Travis, Richard)
December 27, 2023 Filing 27 [FILED IN ERROR] Defendants Yopo Expedite, Inc. and Abdinasir Omar ANSWER to #1 with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Defendants Trigg Freight, Inc., John Wiebe, GDT Enterprises, Ltd., Laurence Kroeker, and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company against Trigg Freight, Inc. by Yopo Expedite, Inc. (Travis, Richard) Modified on 12/28/2023 to add text (KLE).
December 27, 2023 Filing 26 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Yopo Expedite, Inc.. (Travis, Richard)
December 22, 2023 Filing 25 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by State Farm Insurance Company. (Beck, Molly)
December 22, 2023 Filing 24 Separate ANSWER to #1 by State Farm Insurance Company. (Beck, Molly)
December 21, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE by Dietrich Hamrick, Ryan Hamrick, Tiffany Hamrick OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Notice of Magistrate, #4 Exhibit Admission of Service)(Lanham, Kimberly)
December 21, 2023 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Kimberly Lanham OF COMPLIANCE. (Lanham, Kimberly)
December 21, 2023 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE by Dietrich Hamrick, Ryan Hamrick, Tiffany Hamrick (Lanham, Kimberly)
December 21, 2023 Filing 20 ADMISSION of Service of Summons, Complaint, Notice served on Monae Johnson on 12-21-2023, filed by Dietrich Hamrick, Ryan Hamrick, Tiffany Hamrick. (Lanham, Kimberly)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint . State Farm Insurance Company answer due 12/22/2023. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 12/20/2023. (JLS)
December 20, 2023 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Defendant YOPO Expedite, Inc., and Abdinasir Omar by Yopo Expedite, Inc.. (Travis, Richard)
December 20, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dietrich Hamrick, Ryan Hamrick, Tiffany Hamrick. AO Express, LLC served on 12/15/2023, answer due 1/5/2024., RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant AO Express, LLC on Teresa Lynn Arneson (Lanham, Kimberly)
December 20, 2023 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE Unexecuted. Attempted as to Defendant John Wiebe. (Lanham, Kimberly)
December 19, 2023 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by State Farm Insurance Company. (Beck, Molly)
December 19, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly K. Beck on behalf of State Farm Insurance Company. (Beck, Molly)
December 13, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Travis on behalf of Abdinasir Omar. (Travis, Richard)
December 13, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Travis on behalf of Yopo Expedite, Inc.. (Travis, Richard)
December 13, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon D. Meshbesher on behalf of GDT Enterprises, LTD, Laurence Kroeker. (Meshbesher, Brandon)
December 13, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 , CROSSCLAIM against AO Express, LLC by Laurence Kroeker, GDT Enterprises, LTD. (Meshbesher, Brandon)
December 4, 2023 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Trigg Freight, Inc. re: #4 Summons Issued,,, . Acknowledgement filed by Dietrich Hamrick, Ryan Hamrick, Tiffany Hamrick. (Lanham, Kimberly)
November 30, 2023 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to State Farm Insurance Company re: #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued,,, . Acknowledgement filed by Dietrich Hamrick, Ryan Hamrick, Tiffany Hamrick. (Lanham, Kimberly)
November 28, 2023 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Yopo Expedite, Inc. on 11-27-2023 (Lanham, Kimberly)
November 28, 2023 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant GDT Enterprises, LTD on 11-27-2023 (Lanham, Kimberly)
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Abdinasir Omar served on 11/22/2023. (Lanham, Kimberly)
November 21, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to AO Express, LLC, GDT Enterprises, LTD, Laurence Kroeker, Abdinasir Omar, State Farm Insurance Company, Trigg Freight, Inc., John Wiebe, Yopo Expedite, Inc. 8 Summons(es) delivered via electronic delivery to counsel. CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLE)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402.00 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-4167117, in shell case on 11/21/2023 filed by Dietrich Hamrick, Ryan Hamrick, Tiffany Hamrick. (JLS)
November 21, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamrick et al v. AO Express, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Hamrick
Represented By: A. Russell Janklow
Represented By: Kimberly J. Lanham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Hamrick
Represented By: A. Russell Janklow
Represented By: Kimberly J. Lanham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dietrich Hamrick
Represented By: A. Russell Janklow
Represented By: Kimberly J. Lanham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AO Express, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yopo Expedite, Inc. doing business as AO Express, LLC
Represented By: Richard L. Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trigg Freight, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wiebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GDT Enterprises, LTD
Represented By: Brandon D. Meshbesher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurence Kroeker
Represented By: Brandon D. Meshbesher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Insurance Company doing business as State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Molly K. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Abdinasir Omar
Represented By: Richard L. Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Yopo Expedite, Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: State Farm Insurance Company
Represented By: Molly K. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?