Khuu v. Citibank, National Association
Plaintiff: Vivian Khuu
Defendant: Citibank, National Association
Case Number: 4:2024cv04037
Filed: March 5, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles B Kornmann
Referring Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Compel ARBITRATION & STAY PROCEEDINGS Declaration of Vivian Khuu in Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Vivian Khuu. (Tysdal, Matthew)
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Compel ARBITRATION & STAY PROCEEDINGS filed by All Plaintiffs. (Tysdal, Matthew)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Oren Faircloth for Vivian Khuu. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 4/22/2024. (JLS)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David DiSabato for Vivian Khuu. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 4/22/2024. (JLS)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lisa Considine for Vivian Khuu. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 4/22/2024. (JLS)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney Oren Faircloth to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4261928) by Vivian Khuu. (Tysdal, Matthew)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney David DiSabato to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4261921) by Vivian Khuu. (Tysdal, Matthew)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney Lisa Considine to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4261914) by Vivian Khuu. (Tysdal, Matthew)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DECLARATION of Laura M. Neill re #13 Memorandum in Support of Motion #12 Motion to Compel Arbitration & Stay Proceedings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Original Signature Card_Redacted, #2 Exhibit B. Consent to Convert Consumer Banking Package_Redacted, #3 Exhibit C. ESign Certificate of Completion_Redacted, #4 Exhibit D. November 18, 2021 Client Manual and Marketplace Addendum) (Rahn, Timothy) Modified on 4/15/2024 to link to original motion (KLE).
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (FILED IN ERROR) DECLARATION of Laura M. Neill re #13 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration & Stay Proceedings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Original Signature Card, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Consent to Convert Consumer Banking Package, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - ESign Certificate of Completion, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - November 18, 2021 Client Manual and Marketplace Addendum) (Rahn, Timothy) Modified security and text on 4/12/2024 (TAL).
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Compel ARBITRATION & STAY PROCEEDINGS filed by Citibank, National Association. (Rahn, Timothy)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Compel ARBITRATION & STAY PROCEEDINGS by Citibank, National Association. (Rahn, Timothy)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 by Citibank, National Association. (Rahn, Timothy)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Filing Error: #14 Declaration, was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Rahn, Timothy)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Citibank, National Association UNOPPOSED. (Rahn, Timothy)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas F Burke for Citibank, National Association. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 4/1/2024. (JLS)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Citibank, National Association identifying Corporate Parent Citibank, N.A., Other Affiliate Citigroup, Inc., Other Affiliate Citicorp for Citibank, National Association. (Rahn, Timothy)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Thomas F. Burke to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4249505) by Citibank, National Association. (Rahn, Timothy)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol for all further proceedings. U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann no longer assigned to case. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 3/22/2024. (JLS)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy R. Rahn on behalf of Citibank, National Association. (Rahn, Timothy)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons/Complaint served on Citibank, N.A. on March 8, 2024, filed by Vivian Khuu. (Tysdal, Matthew)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Citibank, National Association. 1 Summons(es) delivered via electronic delivery to counsel. (KLE)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Vivian Khuu. (Tysdal, Matthew)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $405 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-4231698, in shell case on 3/5/24 filed by Vivian Khuu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consumer Deposit Account Agreement) (JLS)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khuu v. Citibank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Khuu
Represented By: Matthew A. Tysdal
Represented By: Pete Heidepriem
Represented By: Scott N. Heidepriem
Represented By: David DiSabato
Represented By: Lisa Considine
Represented By: Oren Faircloth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, National Association
Represented By: Thomas F Burke
Represented By: Timothy R. Rahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?