Richmond v. State of South Dakota et al
Plaintiff: Courtney Richmond
Defendant: State of South Dakota, Trooper Jordan Anderson, Officer Kevin Krohn, Cody Jansen, Daniel Hagger, Mark Hodges, United States District Court Southern Devision, Minnehaha County Civil Clerks Office and Matt Thelen
Case Number: 4:2024cv04067
Filed: April 10, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Referring Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act - Civil Action for Deprivation of Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 MOTION to Extend Deadlines for Reply Brief in Support of His Rule 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Officer Kevin Krohn's deadline to file his reply brief is enlarged to June 21, 2024. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 06/05/2024. (MSB) Sent to Plaintiff via USPS on 6/6/2024 (MSB).
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Extend Deadlines for Reply Brief in Support of His Rule 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss by Kevin Krohn. (Murphy, Matthew)
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mark Hodges. (Hofmann, Michaele)
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Michaele Sanders Hofmann on behalf of Mark Hodges. (Hofmann, Michaele)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 BRIEF by Plaintiff Courtney Richmond (DJP)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for an Order Compelling Disclosure of Discovery by Courtney Richmond. (Attachments: #1 attachment - receipt) (JLS)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to DISMISS in Lieu of Filing an Answer filed by Kevin Krohn. (Murphy, Matthew)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to DISMISS in Lieu of Filing an Answer by Kevin Krohn. (Murphy, Matthew)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Murphy on behalf of Kevin Krohn. (Murphy, Matthew)
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF RECUSAL. U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol recused. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 05/09/2024. Sent to Mr. Richmond via USPS.(MSB)
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange added. (SLW)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF RECUSAL. U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann recused. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 5/8/2024. (Mailed to Courtney Richmond)(JLS)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ADMISSION of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Benjamin Patterson on April 15, 2024, filed by Mark Hodges, Matt Thelen, United States District Court Southern Devision. (Hofmann, Michaele)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ADMISSION of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Matthew Thelen on April 12, 2024, filed by Matt Thelen. (Hofmann, Michaele)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michaele Sanders Hofmann on behalf of Mark Hodges. (Hofmann, Michaele)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michaele Sanders Hofmann on behalf of Matt Thelen. (Hofmann, Michaele)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michaele Sanders Hofmann on behalf of United States District Court Southern Devision. (Hofmann, Michaele)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol added. (SLW)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann added. (SLW)
April 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier recused. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 4/16/2024. (Mailed to Courtney Richmond)(JLS)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Pursuant to oral request of Plaintiff, electronic notice is terminated effective immediately. Plaintiff will receive documents via United States Postal Service at the address listed on the docket sheet. (MSB)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RECEIPT of USPS dated 4/11/2024 for cost of Plaintiff's certified mailings. Receipt hand-delivered by Plaintiff on 4/11/2024. (DJP)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Jordan Anderson, Daniel Hagger, Mark Hodges, Cody Jansen, Kevin Krohn, Minnehaha County Civil Clerks Office, State of South Dakota, Matt Thelen, United States District Court Southern Devision. 9 Summons(es) delivered via hand-delivery to plaintiff with AO85 paperwork. (MSB)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Courtney Richmond. (MSB)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Courtney Richmond. (MSB)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Courtney Richmond. (MSB)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REGISTRATION for Electronic Notice by Courtney Richmond. Pro se party Courtney Richmond will now receive electronic notice of unsealed documents filed in this case. Refer to the CM/ECF User Manual located on the court website at www.sdd.uscourts.gov for information about accessing documents. (MSB)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing Fee Received from Courtney Richmond. Fee Amount: $405.00, Receipt No.: #400003270. (MSB)
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Complaint together with an Application to Proceed without Prepaying Fees or Costs. A new case has been opened. Copy of docket sheet sent to plaintiff. Pro Se Litigant Registration Form for Electronic Notice also sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Pursuant to the E-Government Act and D.S.D. Civ. LR 5.2, you must redact personal identifiers from documents submitted to the Court. The Clerks Office will not review for compliance. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. A request to electronically file documents in your case must be made through the PACER Service Center at www.pacer.uscourts.gov. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed of the plaintiff's address changes, including changes to primary and secondary email addresses. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (MSB)
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Courtney Richmond. (MSB)
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Courtney Richmond. (MSB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richmond v. State of South Dakota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of South Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trooper Jordan Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Kevin Krohn
Represented By: Matthew D. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Hagger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hodges
Represented By: Michaele Sanders Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States District Court Southern Devision
Represented By: Michaele Sanders Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnehaha County Civil Clerks Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Thelen
Represented By: Michaele Sanders Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?