Smidt et al v. Deere & Company
Plaintiff: Teresa Smidt and Brad Smidt
Defendant: Deere & Company
Case Number: 4:2024cv04072
Filed: April 15, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles B Kornmann
Referring Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2024 Filing 19 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/18/2025 Motions due by 9/26/2025. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2025 at 1:00 PM in Aberdeen Courtroom 1 before U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 6/11/24. (SKK)
June 10, 2024 Filing 18 Discovery Report re #12 Order for Discovery Report by Deere & Company. Related document: #12 Order for Discovery Report.(Stalley, Cassidy)
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Maureen A. Bickley for Deere & Company. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 5/15/24. (SKK)
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Adriana M. Conway for Deere & Company; granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nicholas Constantine Pappas for Deere & Company. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 5/15/24. (SKK)
May 13, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney Nicholas Pappas to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4282435) by Deere & Company. (Stalley, Cassidy)
May 13, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney Maureen Bickley to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4282422) by Deere & Company. (Stalley, Cassidy)
May 13, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney Adriana Conway to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4282404) by Deere & Company. (Stalley, Cassidy)
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 5/13/2024. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Counsel)(SAC)
May 10, 2024 Filing 11 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Deere & Company. (Stalley, Cassidy)
May 10, 2024 Filing 10 CITIZENSHIP Disclosure Statement in Diversity Case re Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Deere & Company. (Stalley, Cassidy)
May 10, 2024 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 with Jury Demand by Deere & Company. (Stalley, Cassidy)
May 10, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Cassidy M. Stalley on behalf of Deere & Company. (Stalley, Cassidy)
May 1, 2024 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Deere & Company served on CT Corporation System, as Registered Agent. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Hughes County Sheriff's Return of Personal Service on CT Corp, Reg Agent for Defendant)(Hagen, Alex)
April 17, 2024 Filing 6 Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann. (SKK)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier recused. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 4/16/24. (SKK)
April 16, 2024 Filing 4 Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier. (SKK)
April 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol recused. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 4/16/24. (SKK)
April 15, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Deere & Company. 1 Summons(es) delivered via electronic delivery to counsel. CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SKK)
April 15, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $405 fee paid, receipt# BSDDC-4262235, in shell case on 4/15/24 filed by Teresa Smidt, Brad Smidt. (SKK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smidt et al v. Deere & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Smidt
Represented By: Alex M. Hagen
Represented By: Stephen C. Landon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Smidt
Represented By: Alex M. Hagen
Represented By: Stephen C. Landon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deere & Company
Represented By: Cassidy M. Stalley
Represented By: Adriana M. Conway
Represented By: Maureen A. Bickley
Represented By: Nicholas Constantine Pappas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?