Rockboy v. Charles Mix County et al
Plaintiff: Chaske Rockboy
Defendant: Charles Mix County, Randy Thaler, Derik Rolston and Jan Budavich
Case Number: 4:2024cv04093
Filed: May 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Referring Judge: Eric C Schulte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act - Civil Action for Deprivation of Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Moore on behalf of All Defendants. (Moore, James)
June 14, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Bergeson on behalf of All Defendants. (Bergeson, Justin)
June 11, 2024 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge Eric C Schulte for all further proceedings. U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier no longer assigned to case. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 06/11/2024. (AKW)
June 11, 2024 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chaske Rockboy. Randy Thaler waiver sent on 6/1/2024, answer due 7/31/2024. (Volesky, Tucker)
June 11, 2024 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chaske Rockboy. Derik Rolston waiver sent on 6/1/2024, answer due 7/31/2024. (Volesky, Tucker)
June 11, 2024 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chaske Rockboy. Jan Budavich waiver sent on 6/1/2024, answer due 7/31/2024. (Volesky, Tucker)
June 11, 2024 Filing 4 ADMISSION of Service of June 6, 2024 of Summons and Complaint served on Keith Mushitz, Chairman of the Charles Mix County Commission on June 6, 2024, filed by Chaske Rockboy. (Volesky, Tucker)
May 30, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jan Budavich, Charles Mix County, Derik Rolston, and Randy Thaler. 4 Summons(es) delivered via electronic delivery to counsel. CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms . (MSB)
May 29, 2024 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Chaske Rockboy. (Volesky, Tucker)
May 12, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $405 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-4281502, in shell case on 05/12/2024 filed by Chaske Rockboy. (JMS) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/13/2024) (JMS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rockboy v. Charles Mix County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaske Rockboy
Represented By: Tucker J. Volesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Mix County
Represented By: Justin Bergeson
Represented By: James E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Thaler
Represented By: James E. Moore
Represented By: Justin Bergeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derik Rolston
Represented By: James E. Moore
Represented By: Justin Bergeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Budavich
Represented By: James E. Moore
Represented By: Justin Bergeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?