Yin v. Frazier et al
Plaintiff: Hong Yin
Defendant: Denise Frazier, Emilio T. Gonzalez, Michael Chartoff and Michael B. Mukasey
Case Number: 5:2010cv05013
Filed: March 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Western Division Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L. Viken
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 02:431 Fed. Election Commission: Failure Enforce C
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Dismissing Case. Signed by U. S. District Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 4/12/11. (SB)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Rejecting Magistrate Judge's 25 Report and Recommendation; denying without prejudice defendants' 4 Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment; denying without prejudice plaintiff's 9 Motion for Hearing. Case transferred to the United States District Court for the District of South Dakota, Western Division. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on February 22, 2010. (DML)[Transferred from Minnesota on 3/9/2010.]
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 9 MOTION for Hearing filed by Hong Yin should be DENIED and 4 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Emilio T. Gonzalez, Denise Frazier, Michael Chartoff, Michael B. Mukasey should be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 7/20/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 7/2/09. (akl) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/9/2010.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yin v. Frazier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hong Yin
Represented By: Marcus A Jarvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Frazier
Represented By: Lonnie F. Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emilio T. Gonzalez
Represented By: Lonnie F. Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Chartoff
Represented By: Lonnie F. Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael B. Mukasey
Represented By: Lonnie F. Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?