Ixtlilco-Hernandez v. United States of America

Petitioner: Armando Ixtlilco-Hernandez
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2012cv05020
Filed: April 4, 2012
Court: South Dakota District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: Aurora
Referring Judge: John E. Simko
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L. Viken
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Case and declining to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 9/9/15. (SB)
July 25, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re Attorney-Client Privilege Waiver. Attorney Christensen shall file an affidavit within 14 days; with Government's response due 30 days after. Signed by US Magistrate Judge John E. Simko on 7/25/13. (SLW)
July 9, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rejecting 16 Report and Recommendation and ordering that 2255 Motion and supplement shall remain active and all further proceedings shall be conducted by Magistrate Judge Simko. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 7/9/13. (TAL) (Main Document 19 replaced on 7/9/2013) (TAL).
November 29, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court (FILED IN ERROR) ORDER. The Clerk of Court will deliver or serve a copy of the motion on the United States Attorney for the District of South Dakota. The USA for the District of South Dakota will file and serve an answer or responsive pleading to the petition, together with a legal brief or memorandum in support thereof, on or before January 4, 2013. Signed by US Magistrate Judge John E. Simko on 11/29/12. (DJP) Modified on 11/30/2012 (DJP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ixtlilco-Hernandez v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Armando Ixtlilco-Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Mark Edward Salter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?