Atmosphere Hospitality Management, LLC v. Shiba Investments, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Atmosphere Hospitality Management, LLC
Defendant: Shiba Investments, Inc. and Karim Merali
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Shiba Investments, Inc. and Karim Merali
Thirdparty_defendant: James Henderson
Counter_claimant: Shiba Investments, Inc. and Karim Merali
Counter_defendant: Atmosphere Hospitality Management, LLC and James Henderson
Case Number: 5:2013cv05040
Filed: May 20, 2013
Court: South Dakota District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: Pennington
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2016 290 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 214 Motion for Disqualify; denying 262 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 1/29/2016. (JLS)
November 9, 2015 288 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 269 Motion to Amend; denying 278 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/9/15. (DJP)
July 29, 2015 258 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 150 Motion for Sanctions; denying as moot 220 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot 246 Motion to deem facts admitted.Defendants to fully satisfy their outstanding discovery obligations by 8/20/2015. Defendants to pay Atmosphere $4,422.32 by 8/20/2015. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 7/29/2015. (KC)
June 5, 2015 255 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 195 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 6/5/2015. (KC)
March 11, 2015 225 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 187 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 3/11/2015. (CG)
March 3, 2015 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 175 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 3/3/2015. (CG)
January 9, 2015 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 147 Motion for Attorney Fees and issuing briefing schedule on motion for sanctions. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 1/9/2015. (KC)
January 2, 2015 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 127 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 01/02/15. (Duffy, Veronica)
July 8, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 58 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 63 Motion to Continue; granting 79 Motion to Extend. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 7/8/2014. (KC)
February 20, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 56 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying as moot 16 Motion to Dismiss; granting 21 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 2/20/2014. (KC)
December 18, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/18/2013. (KC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atmosphere Hospitality Management, LLC v. Shiba Investments, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atmosphere Hospitality Management, LLC
Represented By: Sara Frankenstein
Represented By: David E. Lust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiba Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Courtney R. Clayborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karim Merali
Represented By: Courtney R. Clayborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Shiba Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Courtney R. Clayborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Karim Merali
Represented By: Courtney R. Clayborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: James Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Shiba Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Courtney R. Clayborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Karim Merali
Represented By: Courtney R. Clayborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Atmosphere Hospitality Management, LLC
Represented By: Sara Frankenstein
Represented By: David E. Lust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: James Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?