Cheval International et al v. Smartpak Equine, LLC
Plaintiff: Cheval International and August K. Anderson
Defendant: Smartpak Equine, LLC
Case Number: 5:2014cv05010
Filed: February 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Western Division Office
County: Meade
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L. Viken
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER denying 90 Motion to Dismiss; granting 94 Motion for Leave to take the deposition of Rebecca Minard; granting 104 Motion allowing August Anderson to turn Cheval into a Sole Proprietorship, and hereinafter the named Plaintiff in this case will be "August K. Anderson, d/b/a Cheval International, a sole proprietorship"; denying as moot 126 Motion to Compel. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 3/17/17. (DJP)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER re 104 MOTION for order allowing August Anderson to turn Cheval into sole proprietorship. On or before 12/16/16 Plaintiff Anderson must file with the Clerk and serve on opposing counsel proof that the legal structure of Cheval International has been changed to a sole proprietorship. If Cheval International is not converted to a sole proprietorship it must obtain new counsel of record on or before 12/16/16. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 11/22/16. (SLW)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 3/15/2016. (JLS)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 2/26/15. (SB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheval International et al v. Smartpak Equine, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheval International
Represented By: Phillip R. Stiles
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Swett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: August K. Anderson
Represented By: Phillip R. Stiles
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Swett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smartpak Equine, LLC
Represented By: Thomas G. Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?