Thompson v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Scott Thompson
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2016cv05035
Filed: May 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Western Division Office
County: Pennington
Presiding Judge: Veronica L. Duffy
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L. Viken
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 75 Motion to Dismiss; adopting 86 Report and Recommendation and declining to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 5/29/19. (SB)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion to Quash. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 3/28/2017. (CG)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing service and requiring response to be filed by July 1, 2016. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 5/31/2016. (CG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Koliner(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?