Tovares v. Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Annie Tovares
Defendant: Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. and Praetorian Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2016cv05051
Filed: June 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Western Division Office
County: Pennington
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L. Viken
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER denying 73 Motion to Strike; denying 77 at p. 6, Motion to exclude. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 9/13/19. (SB)
March 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 3/30/19. (SB) Modified on 4/1/2019 to change to an opinion (SKK).
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting 60 Motion for Leave to file amended answers. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 3/25/19. (SB)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying 11 Motion to Dismiss; denying 12 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 18 Motion for Leave to file supplemental authority; adopting 25 Report and Recommendation; overruling 26 Objection to Report and Recommendation. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 9/12/17. (SB)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 20 Motion to Compel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Daneta Wollmann on 8/15/17. (SST)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tovares v. Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Tovares
Represented By: Michael C. Abourezk
Represented By: Michael J. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.
Represented By: J. Crisman Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Praetorian Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael C. Loos
Represented By: J. Crisman Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?