Schrader v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Susan Marie Schrader
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2016cv05110
Filed: December 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Western Division Office
County: Oglala Lakota
Presiding Judge: Veronica L. Duffy
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Susan Marie Schrader. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/17/17. (DJP)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying 21 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 6/2/2017. (CG)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for service. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 12/5/2016. (CG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schrader v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Marie Schrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Stephanie C. Bengford
Represented By: Kevin Koliner(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?