Bissonette v. Dooley et al
Petitioner: Danny D. Bissonette
Respondent: Robert Dooley, David Gilbertson and Craig A. Pfeifle
Case Number: 5:2016cv05120
Filed: December 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Western Division Office
County: Pennington
Presiding Judge: Veronica L. Duffy
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L. Viken
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying 18 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 11/15/17. (SB)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 10 Motion to Dismiss; adopting 14 Report and Recommendation; overruling 15 Objection to Report and Recommendation and declining to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 9/11/17. (SB)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for briefs regarding timeliness to be filed by the parties on or before February 3, 2017. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 1/3/2017. (CG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bissonette v. Dooley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Danny D. Bissonette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Dooley
Represented By: Craig M. Eichstadt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Gilbertson
Represented By: Craig M. Eichstadt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Craig A. Pfeifle
Represented By: Craig M. Eichstadt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?