Hollow Horn Bear v. Daugaard et al
Petitioner: Eugene T. Hollow Horn Bear
Respondent: Marty Jackley, Attorney General of the State of South Dakota, Lara R. Roetzel, Dennis Daugaard and Warden Brent Fluke
Case Number: 5:2018cv05065
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Veronica L Duffy
Referring Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus - General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER--if petitioner Eugene Hollow Horn Bear wishes to oppose respondents' motion to dismiss [Docket No. 10], he must file a written brief in opposition to the motion setting forth applicable law and facts within 21 days. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 10/11/18. (Duffy, Veronica)
October 10, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to DISMISS Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Brent Fluke, Marty Jackley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - US District Court Judgment 89-40013, #2 Exhibit 2 - Pennington County Judgment 13-3743, #3 Exhibit 3 - Pennington County Judgment 14-4671, #4 Exhibit 4 - US District Court Complaint 18-5065) (Strohman, John) Modified on 10/11/2018 (DJP).
October 10, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to DISMISS Writ of Habeas Corpus by Brent Fluke, Marty Jackley. (Strohman, John)
October 5, 2018 Filing 9 LETTER Received from Eugene Hollow Horn Bear to Judge Duffy re clarification on how the case is being construed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 9/28/18) (SLW)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying petitioner Eugene Hollow Horn Bear's #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 10/2/18. (Duffy, Veronica)
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Eugene T. Hollow Horn Bear. (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 9-26-2018) (SLT)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing service upon respondents. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 9/19/2018. (CG)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254),, by Eugene T. Hollow Horn Bear. (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 9-7-2018) (SLT)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 New Case LETTER with enclosed copy of docket sheet and 2254 packet sent by Clerk's Office to Petitioner. (TAL)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 PRISONER Trust Account Statement. (SST)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eugene T. Hollow Horn Bear. (SST)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254 filed by Eugene T. Hollow Horn Bear. (Attachments: #1 Judgment; Case Number CR89-40013-01, #2 Judgment; File No. CR114-4671, #3 Dismissal; File No CR114-4671, #4 Judgment; file No. 13-3743, #5 7/14/18 Letter to Clerk of Courts, Seventh Judicial Circuit, #6 7/24/18 Letter to Kris vasilakes, Legal Secretary, #7 Second 7/24/18 Letter to Kris Vasilakes, Legal Secretary, #8 7/31/18 Letter from Alicia Fuller, #9 8/3/18 Letter to Honorable Jane Wipf Pfeifle, #10 Envelope postmarked 8/29/18) (SST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollow Horn Bear v. Daugaard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eugene T. Hollow Horn Bear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marty Jackley
Represented By: John M. Strohman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of South Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lara R. Roetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dennis Daugaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Brent Fluke
Represented By: John M. Strohman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?