CAMPBELL v. FLUKE et al
Petitioner: KELLY JOE CAMPBELL
Respondent: Darin Young, Dennis Daugaard, Brent Fluke and Marty Jackley
Case Number: 5:2018cv05077
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
Referring Judge: Daneta Wollmann
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus - Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by KELLY JOE CAMPBELL. (SST)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall restrict access to the parties to 1 Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 11/6/18. (SB)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:18-cv-02191. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 5, 2018 Case transferred to the USDC for the District of South Dakota, pursuant to Court Order entered 10/15/2018. Sent to Court Electronically. (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/5/2018.]
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the District of South Dakota. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 11/4/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/12/2018. (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/5/2018.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 PARTIAL PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by KELLY JOE CAMPBELL (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/5/2018.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by KELLY JOE CAMPBELL (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/5/2018.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DENNIS DAUGAARD, BRENT FLUKE, MARTY JACKLEY, DARIN YOUNG filed by KELLY JOE CAMPBELL.(zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/5/2018.]
September 4, 2018 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 9/4/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/5/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAMPBELL v. FLUKE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Darin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dennis Daugaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brent Fluke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marty Jackley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KELLY JOE CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?