Dodd v. Jenkins et al

Plaintiff: Brian Dodd
Defendant: Sam Jenkins and LEAPS Program
Case Number: 5:2018cv05084
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #7 Motion to Electronically File Documents in CM/ECF. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 12/7/18. (SB)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Electronically File Documents. Pro se party Brian Dodd will now receive electronic notice of unsealed documents filed in this case, but must wait for a Court ruling regarding e-filing. Refer to the CM/ECF User Manual located on the court website at www.sdd.uscourts.gov for information about accessing documents. (DJP)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 New Case LETTER with enclosed copy of the docket sheet and Pro Se Litigant Application Form sent by Clerk's Office to Brian Dodd. (JLS)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE/REPORT on Filing of Action Regarding Copyright mailed US Patent & Trademark Office. (JLS)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brian Dodd. (JLS)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (JLS)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Brian Dodd. (Attachments: #1 Emails, #2 Copyright documents, #3 Website screen shots, #4 July 2018 Amended Joint Stipulated Settlement, #5 October 2012 Joint Stipulated Settlement) (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dodd v. Jenkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEAPS Program
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?