Stanko v. State of South Dakota et al
Plaintiff: Rudy Stanko and Butch
Defendant: Austin Chafin, Defendants 1x through 4x, State of South Dakota, Jailer Brandon Luther, Carol Foster, Marya Vrooman Tellinguisen, James Sword and Marya Vrooman Tellinghuisen
Case Number: 5:2018cv05088
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to #18 Response to Motion filed by Carol Foster, State of South Dakota, Marya Vrooman Tellinghuisen. (Anderson, Robert)
January 24, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Defendants re #5 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction , #16 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Rudy Stanko. (KLE)
December 28, 2018 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Brandon Luther, James Sword. (Sutton, Ryan)
December 28, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim by Brandon Luther, James Sword. (Sutton, Ryan)
December 28, 2018 NOTICE of Filing Error: #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Mann, Rebecca)
December 27, 2018 Filing 15 FILED IN ERROR: MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Brandon Luther, James Sword. (Mann, Rebecca) Modified text on 12/28/2018 (SST).
December 27, 2018 Filing 14 FILED IN ERROR: MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim by Brandon Luther, James Sword. (Mann, Rebecca) Modified text on 12/28/2018 (SST).
December 27, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan C. Sutton on behalf of Brandon Luther, James Sword. (Sutton, Ryan)
December 27, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca L. Mann on behalf of Brandon Luther, James Sword. (Mann, Rebecca)
December 26, 2018 Filing 11 Defendant Austin Chaffin's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Austin Chafin. (Shiffermiller, Kassie)
December 26, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kassie McKie Shiffermiller on behalf of Austin Chafin. (Shiffermiller, Kassie)
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed with certified mail by Rudy Stanko. State of South Dakota served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (KLE)
December 26, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendants Austin Chafin, Carol Foster, Brandon Luther, James Sword, Marya Vrooman Tellinghuisen on 12/05/2018 (KLE) Modified on 12/26/2018 to correct spelling(KLE).
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Brady on behalf of Austin Chafin. (Brady, Thomas)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Carol Foster, State of South Dakota, Marya Vrooman Tellinghuisen. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Anderson, Robert) Modified on 12/26/2018 to correct spelling (KLE).
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction by Carol Foster, State of South Dakota, Marya Vrooman Tellinguisen. (Anderson, Robert)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 New Case LETTER with enclosed docket sheet, Rule 4 and CM/ECF Pro-Se Litigant Application Form sent by Clerk's Office to Rudy "Butch" Stanko. (KLE)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Austin Chafin, Carol Foster, Brandon Luther, State of South Dakota, James Sword, Marya Vrooman Tellinghuisen. 6 original summons, 7 A085s, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff Rudy Stanko via hand-delivery. (KLE) Modified on 12/26/2018 to correct spelling (KLE).
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Filing Fee Received from Rudy Stanko. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #SDX500005545. (KLE)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Rudy Stanko. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (KLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanko v. State of South Dakota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Chafin
Represented By: Thomas E. Brady
Represented By: Kassie McKie Shiffermiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants 1x through 4x
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of South Dakota
Represented By: Robert B. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jailer Brandon Luther
Represented By: Rebecca L. Mann
Represented By: Ryan C. Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Foster
Represented By: Robert B. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marya Vrooman Tellinguisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Sword
Represented By: Rebecca L. Mann
Represented By: Ryan C. Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marya Vrooman Tellinghuisen
Represented By: Robert B. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudy Stanko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Butch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?