Childress v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Emily Childress
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 5:2019cv05016
Filed: February 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
Nature of Suit: Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (E.R.I.S.A.)
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 4/22/19. (SB)
April 22, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Linde, Paul)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel K. Ryan. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 4/4/19. (SB)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Peter E. Pederson. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 4/4/19. (SB)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Life Insurance Company of North America answer due 4/23/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 3/27/19. (SB)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3022105) by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Linde, Paul)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Peter E. Pederson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3021988) by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Linde, Paul)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER by Life Insurance Company of North America re #5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Linde, Paul)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Linde, Paul)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul H. Linde on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Linde, Paul)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 ADMISSION OF SERVICE Executed by Larry Deiter, Director of Div. of Insurance Admission filed by Emily Childress. (Simpson, Michael)
February 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. 1 original summons, 1 A085s, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO 85 form)(SKK)
February 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, ($400 fee paid, receipt# SDX500005692) filed by Emily Childress. (SKK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Childress v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Childress
Represented By: Michael J. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Peter E. Pederson
Represented By: Daniel K. Ryan
Represented By: Paul H. Linde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?