Whitehorse v. Ecoffey
Plaintiff: Guy Randy Whitehorse
Defendant: Robert Ecoffey
Case Number: 5:2019cv05041
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 JUDGMENT in favor of Robert Ecoffey against Guy Randy Whitehorse. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 7/19/19. Mailed to Plaintiff (SRA)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion to Withdraw ; granting #11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 7/19/19. Mailed to Financial Department at Sandstone Federal Correctional Institute and Plaintiff. (SRA)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to DISMISS by Guy Randy Whitehorse. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (SRA)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $271.44 is due by 7/24/2019. Signed by Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 6/18/19. Mailed to Guy Whitehorse and Prison Financial Department. (SLW) Modified to fix Judge on 6/26/2019 (SLW).
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Judge Karen E. Schreier no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 6/18/19. (SB) Mailed on 6/25/2019 (SLW).
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier recused. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 6/17/19. Mailed to Guy Whitehorse(SLW)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus, #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Guy Randy Whitehorse. (SRA)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (SRA)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Guy Randy Whitehorse. (SRA)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier for all further proceedings. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 5/30/19. Mailed to Whitehorse.(SLW)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken recused. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 5/29/19. (SB)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 New Case LETTER with enclosed docket sheet, IFP motion, and PTAR sent by Clerk's Office to Guy Randy Whitehorse. (SLW)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus filed by Guy Randy Whitehorse. (SLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitehorse v. Ecoffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ecoffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy Randy Whitehorse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?