Kurtenbach v. Noem et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Kurtenbach
Defendant: Cassie Wendt, Trevor Jones, Wendy Kloeppner, Jason Ravnsborg, Kristi Noem, The State of South Dakota Obligation Recovery Center and Scott Bollinger
Case Number: 5:2019cv05042
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER Received from Matthew Kurtenbach to Clerk of U.S. District Court. (SRA)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 Mail sent to Matthew Kurtenbach was returned as undeliverable, plaintiff released, no new address given. #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis was returned. (SRA)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE Prerequisite to Action by Matthew Kurtenbach. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(SRA)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 Service LETTER with enclosed doc #4 , summons, USM 285s, samples, and AO85 sent by Clerk's Office to Matthew Kurtenbach. (SLW)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 6/3/19. (SB) Mailed to Plaintiff and Prison on 6/3/2019 (SLW).
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 New Case LETTER with enclosed docket sheet sent by Clerk's Office to Matthew Kurtenbach. (SAC)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Matthew Kurtenbach. (SAC)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Matthew Kurtenbach. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (SAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kurtenbach v. Noem et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassie Wendt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kloeppner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Ravnsborg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Noem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of South Dakota Obligation Recovery Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Bollinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Kurtenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?