Gilbert et al v. Weahkee et al
Plaintiff: Donna M. Gilbert, Julie Mohney and Charmaine White Face
Defendant: RADM Michael D. Weahkee, William Barr and James Driving Hawk
Case Number: 5:2019cv05045
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/ Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for waiver of electronic filing. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 8/5/19. (SB)
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to William Barr, James Driving Hawk, RADM Michael D. Weahkee. 3 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via hand-delivery to attorney. (SLT)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Waiver of Electronic Filing by All Plaintiffs. (CLR)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Court Approval and Certification for Plaintiff's to File a Class Action Lawsuit by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Class Action Lawsuit Consent Forms) (SLT)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by All Plaintiffs. (CLR)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William Barr, James Driving Hawk, RADM Michael D. Weahkee re #9 Notice of Appearance . (Donovan, SaraBeth)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by SaraBeth Donovan on behalf of All Defendants. (Donovan, SaraBeth)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerk's Office has received your Amended Complaint and completed summons(es). A new case has previously been opened. You are responsible for arranging service of the summons(es) and complaint on the defendant(s). If you are interested in receiving electronic notice of documents filed in your case and/or electronically filing documents in your case, complete and return the enclosed CM/ECF Pro Se Litigation Application Form. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. (DJP) Modified on 7/18/2019 to indicate docket sheet mailed to Julie Mohney and Charmaine White Face (DJP).
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to RADM Michael D. Weahkee, James Driving Hawk and William Barr. Summmons, AO 85 form for each Defendant and Rule 73 Memo handed to Plaintiff Donna Gilbert. Copy of Fed.R.Civ.P.4 and 4.1 previously handed to Donna Gilbert on 7/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Summons for RADM Michael D. Weahkee, James Driving Hawk and William Barr, #2 AO85)(DJP)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to RADM Michael D. Weahkee. One Summons, a Rule 73 Memo and AO 85 for each party handed to Donna Gilbert. (Attachments: #1 RADM Michael D. Weahkee Summons #2 AO85) Copy of Fed.R.Civ.P.4 and 4.1 previously handed to Donna Gilbert on 7/10/2019 (DJP)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Donna M. Gilbert, Charmaine White Face, Julie Mohney. (DJP)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for Electronic Notice by Donna M. Gilbert. Pro se party Donna M. Gilbert will now receive electronic notice of unsealed documents filed in this case. Refer to the CM/ECF User Manual located on the court website at www.sdd.uscourts.gov for information about accessing documents. (DJP)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Complaint together with the filing fee. A new case has been opened. If you are interested in receiving electronic notice of documents filed in your case and/or electronically filing documents in your case, complete and return the enclosed CM/ECF Pro Se Litigation Application Form. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. Mailed Rule 73 Memo and (3) AO 85 forms to plaintiff (KLE)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (KLE)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ($400 fee paid, receipt# SDX500005900) filed by Donna M. Gilbert. (KLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilbert et al v. Weahkee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna M. Gilbert
Represented By: Patrick A. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Mohney
Represented By: Patrick A. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charmaine White Face
Represented By: Patrick A. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RADM Michael D. Weahkee
Represented By: SaraBeth Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: SaraBeth Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Driving Hawk
Represented By: SaraBeth Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?