Patterson v. W.R. Berkley Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Patterson
Defendant: W.R. Berkley Corporation and Berkley Human Services
Case Number: 5:2019cv05048
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney C. Todd Koebele to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3134575) by Berkley Human Services, W.R. Berkley Corporation. (Palmer, J.)
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Berkley Human Services, W.R. Berkley Corporation. (Palmer, J.)
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Berkley Human Services, W.R. Berkley Corporation. (Palmer, J.)
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 Motion/ STIPULATION to Voluntarily Dismiss W.R. Berkley Corporation, Substitute Parties, Modify the Caption, to Amend the Amended Complaint, and to Extend the Time to Answer by Berkley Human Services, W.R. Berkley Corporation. (Palmer, J.) Modified to change event to motion on 8/8/2019 (SLW).
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Crisman Palmer on behalf of Berkley Human Services, W.R. Berkley Corporation. (Palmer, J.)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Seal Existing Document. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 7/30/19. (SB)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Affidavit of Service - Berkley Human Services, f/k/a Riverport Insurance Company Acknowledgement filed by Joseph R. Patterson. (Lee, Brad)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Proof of Service - W.R. Berkley Corporation Acknowledgement filed by Joseph R. Patterson. (Lee, Brad)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Reissued as to Berkley Human Services, W.R. Berkley Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Berkley)(SLW)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS(ES) by Joseph R. Patterson. (Lee, Brad)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand filed by Joseph R. Patterson. (Lee, Brad)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal Existing Document #1 Complaint Plaintiff's Motion to Seal - Ex. 1 (Doc. 1-1) by Joseph R. Patterson. (Lee, Brad)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. 1 Summmons, a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85 for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(CLR)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3106242) filed by Joseph R. Patterson in shell case on 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Berkley Claims File) (CLR) Attachment 1 sealed per chambers on 7/17/2019 (SST).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. W.R. Berkley Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.R. Berkley Corporation
Represented By: J. Crisman Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkley Human Services
Represented By: J. Crisman Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Patterson
Represented By: Brad J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?