Hop v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Kymberly A. Hop
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 5:2019cv05055
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (E.R.I.S.A.)
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 9/18/2019. (SLT)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent CIGNA Corporation for Life Insurance Company of North America. (Swanson, Emily)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Swanson, Emily)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Margaret Ann Santos. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/23/2019. (SLT)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel K. Ryan. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/23/2019. (SLT)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Life Insurance Company of North America to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Swanson, Emily)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Margaret Ann Santos to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3138497) by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Swanson, Emily)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3138472) by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Swanson, Emily)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily M. Swanson on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Swanson, Emily)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed August 7, 2019 Acknowledgement filed by Kymberly A. Hop. (Leach, James)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. 1 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(SLT)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# SDX500005941) filed by Kymberly A. Hop. (SLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hop v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Margaret Ann Santos
Represented By: Emily M. Swanson
Represented By: Daniel K. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kymberly A. Hop
Represented By: James D. Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?