Duszak v. Younie et al
Plaintiff: Russell Duszak
Defendant: Jerred Younie, Paul Hinzman, Karl Jegeris and Lieutenant Eisenbraun
Case Number: 5:2019cv05064
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Lieutenant Eisenbraun, Paul Hinzman, Karl Jegeris, Jerred Younie. (DJP)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Russell Duszak. (Demik, Stephen)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand filed by Russell Duszak. (Demik, Stephen)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Troy Kent Walker for Russell Duszak. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 9/13/2019. (SLT)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney Troy K. Walker to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3152450) by Russell Duszak. (Demik, Stephen)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen D. Demik on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Demik, Stephen)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 73 Memo. (Attachments: #1 AO-85)(CLR)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3148940) filed by Russell Duszak in shell case on 9/10/2019. (CLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duszak v. Younie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerred Younie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Hinzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Jegeris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Eisenbraun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Duszak
Represented By: Stephen D. Demik
Represented By: Troy K. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?