Larive v. Viken et al
Plaintiff: James Eugene Larive, Jr.
Defendant: Judge Jeffrey L. Viken, Mr. Peterman and Ms. Collins
Case Number: 5:2020cv05020
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff James Eugene Larive, Jr. re #1 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983). (SKK)
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (SKK)
April 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Eugene Larive, Jr. (SKK)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 3/26/20. (SKK) Modified on 3/27/2020. Sent to James Eugene Larive, Jr. via USPS (SKK).
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. U.S. District Judge Jeffrey L. Viken recused. Signed by U.S. District Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 3/26/20. (SB) Modified: Mailed to James Larive, Jr. on 3/26/2020 (JLS).
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Civil Rights Complaint. Although a new case has been opened, your case cannot proceed further until you either pay the filing fee OR complete and return the enclosed Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees and Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury AND Prisoner Trust Account Report (to be completed by the institution where you are incarcerated). Copy of docket sheet, Application to Proceed IFP, and Prisoner Trust Account Report sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (SKK)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42:1983 - Prisoner Civil Rights filed by James Eugene Larive, Jr. (SKK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larive v. Viken et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Jeffrey L. Viken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Peterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Eugene Larive, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?