Nasuti v. Walmart, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv05023
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Western Division Office
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER denying 71 Sealed Motion. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 07/14/2021. Sent to Mr. Nasuti via USPS on 07/15/2021. (MSB)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 60 Motion to Compel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Daneta Wollmann on 6/8/21. (Wollmann, Daneta)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 56 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 3/18/21. (SLW) Mailed to plaintiff on 3/18/2021 (SLW).
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Memorandum Opinion and ORDER denying 38 Motion to Compel; denying as moot 18 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 23 Motion to Bifurcate; denying as moot 24 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 25 Motion to Compel; denying 26 Motion for Pro tective Order; denying as moot 27 Motion for Protective Order; denying 30 Motion for Sanctions; denying 31 Motion to Compel; denying 33 Motion for Sanctions; denying 33 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 41 Proposed Protective Order. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 11/3/20. (SLW)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 4 Motion to Remand to State Court. ; granting 5 Motion for Protective Order; granting 12 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 06/03/2020. Mailed to Matt Nasuti. (SLW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nasuti v. Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?