High v. Lucas et al
Plaintiff: David Bradley High
Defendant: John Lucas and Brian Fritzie
Case Number: 5:2020cv05028
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 27 LETTER sent by Clerk's Office to Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals pursuant to #26 . (CLR)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER of USCA directing Clerk of the District Court to forward portions of the original record not available in an electronic format through PACER to USCA within 10 days re #22 Notice of Appeal filed by David Bradley High.. (TAL)
June 17, 2020 Filing 25 USCA Case Number for #22 Notice of Appeal filed by David Bradley High. USCA Case Number: 20-2211. (TAL)
June 16, 2020 Filing 24 TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit Court of Appeals re #22 Notice of Appeal. (MSB)
June 16, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Bradley High. (MSB)
June 16, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #18 Judgment by David Bradley High. (Attachments: #1 Identical Notice of Appeal with civil docket sheet.). (MSB) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/17/2020) (MSB).
June 9, 2020 Filing 21 LETTER Received from David High. (MSB)
June 5, 2020 Filing 20 MISCELLANEOUS SUBMISSION by Plaintiff David Bradley High (MSB)
June 3, 2020 Filing 19 MISCELLANEOUS SUBMISSION by Plaintiff David Bradley High (SLW)
June 3, 2020 Filing 18 JUDGMENT in favor of Brian Fritzie, John Lucas against David Bradley High. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 06/03/2020. (MSB)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying as moot #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 06/03/2020. (MSB)
June 2, 2020 Filing 16 DOCUMENT Received from David High. (MSB)
June 2, 2020 Filing 15 LETTER Received from David High. (MSB)
June 2, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER Received from David High. (MSB)
May 27, 2020 Filing 13 LETTER Received from David High. (MSB)
May 27, 2020 Filing 12 LETTER Received from David High. (MSB)
May 27, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER Received from David High. (Attachments: #1 Black Sabbath and Beatles CDs received, covers scanned, originals in RC evidence room) (MSB)
May 22, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER Received from David High. (Attachments: #1 CDs received, covers scanned, originals in RC evidence room) (SLW)
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER Received from David Bradley High to the Federal Courthouse. (MSB)
May 15, 2020 Filing 8 LETTERS Received from David High to Federal Courthouse. (JLS)
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER Received from David Bradley High to the Federal Courthouse. (MSB)
April 28, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER Received re #1 from David Bradley High to Federal Courts. Two identical letters both received the same day. (MSB) Modified docket text on 4/28/2020 (MSB).
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Complaint together with an Application to Proceed without Prepaying Fees or Costs. A new case has been opened. Copy of docket sheet sent to plaintiff. CM/ECF Pro Se Litigant Application Form also sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (MSB) Modified docket text on 4/22/2020 (MSB).
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by David Bradley High. (MSB)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Bradley High. (MSB)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by David Bradley High. Complaint dropped of at Rapid City Clerk's Office on 4/22/2020, but complaint is dated June 21, 2020. All other documents dated 4/21/2020 (MSB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: High v. Lucas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Fritzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bradley High
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?