Temple v. Langdeau et al
Plaintiff: Curtis Temple
Defendant: Mike Carlow, Tony March, Jeremy Langdeau and Shawn Richards
Case Number: 5:2020cv05068
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 24 REPLY to #12 Response to Motion, filed by Mike Carlow, Shawn Richards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Steven Gunn)) (Gunn, Steven)
January 14, 2021 Filing 23 TEXT ORDER granting #22 Motion to Extend. Reply briefs shall be filed by 1/15/21. Signed by U.S. District Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 1/14/21. (SB) Mailed to Tony March on 1/14/2021 (SLW).
January 13, 2021 Filing 22 Consent MOTION to Extend re #12 Response to Motion, by Mike Carlow, Shawn Richards. (Gunn, Steven)
January 12, 2021 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim Failure to Join a Party filed by Jeremy Langdeau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hearing Transcript, #2 Exhibit OST Ordinances, #3 Exhibit Ownership Inspection Cert) (Steve, Michael)
January 12, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY to Motion Response re #4 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim Failure to Join a Party filed by Jeremy Langdeau. (Steve, Michael)
January 6, 2021 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion to Extend. Reply briefs shall be filed by 1/13/21. Signed by U.S. District Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 1/6/21. (SB) Mailed to Tony March on 1/6/2021 (SLW).
January 5, 2021 Filing 18 Consent MOTION to Extend re #12 Response to Motion, by Mike Carlow, Shawn Richards. (Gunn, Steven)
December 30, 2020 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion to Extend. Reply briefs shall be filed by 1/6/21. Signed by U.S. District Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 12/30/20. (SB) Mailed to Tony March on 12/30/2020 (SLW).
December 30, 2020 Filing 16 Consent MOTION to Extend re #12 Response to Motion, by Mike Carlow, Shawn Richards. (Gunn, Steven)
December 30, 2020 NOTICE of Filing Error: #15 Motion to Extend was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Gunn, Steven)
December 29, 2020 Filing 15 Filed in error: Consent MOTION to Extend re #12 Response to Motion, by Mike Carlow, Shawn Richards. (Gunn, Steven) Modified on 12/31/2020 (SLW).
December 16, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Hurley on behalf of Curtis Temple. (Hurley, James)
December 16, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Affidavit of Curtis Temple In Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re #12 Response to Motion, and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 7/7/17 Commissioner meeting minutes , #2 Exhibit 2 - map, #3 Exhibit 3 - Maloney affidavit, #4 Exhibit 4 - local ownership inspection certificate, #5 Exhibit 5 - Brand Inspection Certificate, #6 Exhibit 6 - livestock ownership certificate, #7 Exhibit 7 - shipper's permit, #8 Exhibit 8 - inspector's tally sheet, #9 Exhibit 9 - importation of livestock) (Hurley, James) Modified to add exhibit descriptions on 12/16/2020 (SLW).
December 16, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim Failure to Join a Party, #9 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction under Rule 12(b)(1) and Failure to State a Claim under Rule 12(b)(6) and Certificate of Service filed by Curtis Temple. (Hurley, James)
November 25, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mike Carlow, Shawn Richards re #2 Notice AO Form 85. (Gunn, Steven)
November 25, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction under Rule 12(b)(1) and Failure to State a Claim under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Mike Carlow, Shawn Richards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of Oglala Sioux Tribe Land Director Shawn Richards)) (Gunn, Steven)
November 25, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction under Rule 12(b)(1) and Failure to State a Claim under Rule 12(b)(6) by Mike Carlow, Shawn Richards. (Gunn, Steven)
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim Failure to Join a Party Jeremy Langdeau filed by Jeremy Langdeau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Local Ownership Inspection Certificate, #2 Exhibit B - Notices) (Steve, Michael) Modified to add exhibit descriptions on 12/2/2020 (SLW).
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim Failure to Join a Party Second filed by Jeremy Langdeau. (Steve, Michael)
November 25, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim Failure to Join a Party filed by Jeremy Langdeau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition for Declaratory Judgment, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notices of Trespass, #3 Exhibit - Notices of Intent to Impound, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Sale, #5 Exhibit 5 - Public Notices of Sale and Right to Redeem, #6 Exhibit 6 - Public Notices of Sale of Impounded Stock , #7 Exhibit 7 - Notice of Public Sale, #8 Exhibit 8 - Local Ownership Inspection Certificate) (Steve, Michael) Modified to add exhibit descriptions on 12/2/2020 (SLW).
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim Failure to Join a Party filed by Jeremy Langdeau. (Steve, Michael)
November 25, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim Failure to Join a Party by Jeremy Langdeau. (Steve, Michael)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mike Carlow, Shawn Richards re #1 Notice of Removal, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE AND FILING. (Gunn, Steven)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Rule 73 Memo and AO85. (Attachments: #1 AO85)(MSB)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mike Carlow, Shawn Richards from Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, Pennington County, case number 51CIV20-001364. ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3431195) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summonses and Complaints, #2 Exhibit 2 - Additional State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notices of Consent to Removal)(MSB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Temple v. Langdeau et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Carlow
Represented By: Steven J. Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony March
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Langdeau
Represented By: Michael F. Steve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Richards
Represented By: Steven J. Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Temple
Represented By: James P. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?