Vollmer v. United Seating and Mobility, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: James E. Vollmer
Defendant: United Seating and Mobility, L.L.C. doing business as Numotion and ATG-Colorado, Inc. doing business as Numotion
Case Number: 5:2020cv05082
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO ADMIT NONRESIDENT ATTORNEY granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Clinton T. Speegle for ATG-Colorado, Inc.,Clinton T. Speegle for United Seating and Mobility, L.L.C.. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on February 16, 2021. (DLC)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO ADMIT NONRESIDENT ATTORNEY granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lee M. Hollis for ATG-Colorado, Inc.,Lee M. Hollis for United Seating and Mobility, L.L.C.. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on February 16, 2021. (DLC)
February 16, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney Clinton T. Speegle to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3480826) by ATG-Colorado, Inc., United Seating and Mobility, L.L.C.. (Palmer, J.)
February 16, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney Lee M. Hollis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3480822) by ATG-Colorado, Inc., United Seating and Mobility, L.L.C.. (Palmer, J.)
January 28, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffery D. Collins on behalf of James E. Vollmer. (Collins, Jeffery)
January 26, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by ATG-Colorado, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Seating and Mobility, L.L.C., Corporate Parent NMN Holdings III, Corp for ATG-Colorado, Inc.. (Palmer, J.)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Discovery Report. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on January 21, 2021. (DLC)
January 21, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by United Seating and Mobility, L.L.C.. (Palmer, J.)
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Palmer, J.)
January 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Crisman Palmer on behalf of ATG-Colorado, Inc., United Seating and Mobility, L.L.C.. (Palmer, J.)
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Service filed by James E. Vollmer. (Wright, Ross) Modified docket text on 1/22/2021 (JLS).
January 21, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James E. Vollmer. All Defendants. (Wright, Ross)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ATG-Colorado, Inc., United Seating and Mobility, L.L.C.. Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO 85)(DLC)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3454151, in shell case on 12/30/2020 filed by James E. Vollmer on 12/30/2020. (DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vollmer v. United Seating and Mobility, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E. Vollmer
Represented By: Ross M. Wright
Represented By: Cesar A. Juarez
Represented By: Jeffery D. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Seating and Mobility, L.L.C. doing business as Numotion
Represented By: Lee M. Hollis
Represented By: J. Crisman Palmer
Represented By: Clinton T. Speegle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATG-Colorado, Inc. doing business as Numotion
Represented By: Lee M. Hollis
Represented By: J. Crisman Palmer
Represented By: Clinton T. Speegle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?