Chauncey v. Saul
Plaintiff: Thomas Chauncey
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2021cv05014
Filed: March 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
Referring Judge: Daneta Wollmann
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re: Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Judge Jeffrey L. Viken no longer assigned to case. Signed by U.S. District Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 4/26/21. (SB)
April 20, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Thomas Chauncey, Andrew Saul. (MWT)
April 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Delia M. Druley (USA) on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Druley (USA), Delia)
April 9, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to USA. Summmons(es), AO 85, and Rule 73 Memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO85)(DJP)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by U.S. District Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 4/8/21. (SB)
March 5, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thomas Chauncey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (KLE) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2021: #2 Affidavit in Support of Motion) (KLE).
March 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT on Social Security Appeal. (KLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chauncey v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Delia M. Druley (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel - Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Chauncey
Represented By: Margo Tschetter Julius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?