Rogers et al v. Aurora Pump Company et al
Plaintiff: Gerald J. Rogers and Cheryl A. Rogers
Defendant: Powell Valves, SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, Crane Co., Flowserve US Inc., Foster Wheeler Corporation, General Electric Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Goulds Pumps, LLC, Grinnell LLC, ITT LLC, The William Powell Company, Marley Cooling Technologies, Inc., The Marley Cooling Tower Company and Warren Pumps, LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv05046
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 10/1/21. (SB)
September 30, 2021 Filing 54 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Flowserve US Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for Flowserve US Inc.. (Frankenstein, Sara)
September 30, 2021 Filing 53 FLOWSERVE US INC.'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Aurora Pump Company, Crane Co., Foster Wheeler Corporation, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps, LLC, Grinnell LLC, ITT LLC, Powell Valves, SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Warren Pumps, LLC by Flowserve US Inc.. (Frankenstein, Sara)
September 23, 2021 Filing 52 Grinnell LLC's ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #32 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #27 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #34 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #35 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, , ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #32 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #27 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #34 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #35 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, , ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #32 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #27 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #34 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #35 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, , ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #32 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #27 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #34 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #35 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, , ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #32 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #27 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #34 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #35 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, , ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #32 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #27 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #34 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #35 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, by Grinnell LLC. (Steinhoff, Eric)
September 23, 2021 Filing 51 ITT LLC's ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #32 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #27 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #34 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #35 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, , ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #32 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #27 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #34 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #35 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, , ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #32 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #27 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #34 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #35 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, , ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #32 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #27 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #34 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #35 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, , ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #32 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #27 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #34 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #35 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, , ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #32 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #27 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #34 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #35 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, by ITT LLC. (Steinhoff, Eric)
September 23, 2021 Filing 50 Goulds Pumps LLC's ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #32 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #27 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #34 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #35 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, , ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #32 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #27 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #34 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #35 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, , ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #32 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #27 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #34 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #35 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, , ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #32 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #27 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #34 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #35 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, , ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #32 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #27 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #34 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #35 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, , ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #32 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #27 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #34 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #35 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, by Goulds Pumps, LLC. (Steinhoff, Eric)
September 17, 2021 Filing 49 Crane Co.'s ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #32 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #31 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #30 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #34 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #29 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #35 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, , ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #32 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #31 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #30 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #34 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #29 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #35 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, , ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #32 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #31 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #30 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #34 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #29 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #35 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, , ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #32 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #31 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #30 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #34 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #29 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #35 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, , ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #32 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #31 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #30 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #34 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #29 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #35 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, , ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #32 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #31 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #30 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #34 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #29 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #35 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, , ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #32 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #31 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #30 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #34 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #29 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #35 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, , ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #32 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #31 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #30 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #34 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #29 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #35 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, by Crane Co.. (Lindeman, Bradley)
September 16, 2021 Filing 48 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Grinnell LLC identifying Other Affiliate Tyco International plc for Grinnell LLC. (Steinhoff, Eric)
September 16, 2021 Filing 47 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Goulds Pumps, LLC identifying Other Affiliate ITT Inc. for Goulds Pumps, LLC. (Steinhoff, Eric)
September 16, 2021 Filing 46 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by ITT LLC identifying Other Affiliate ITT LLC for ITT LLC. (Steinhoff, Eric)
September 14, 2021 Filing 45 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SPX Corporation for SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.. (Hanson, Laura)
September 14, 2021 Filing 44 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Hanson, Laura)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Heather H. Neubauer for SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc. and Warren Pumps, LLC. Signed by U.S. District Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 9/13/2021. (DJP)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas D. Jensen for Goulds Pumps, LLC, and Grinnell LLC. Signed by U.S. District Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 0/13/21. (SB)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jon R. Russell for Crane Co. Signed by U.S. District Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 9/13/21. (SB)
September 9, 2021 Filing 40 TEXT ORDER granting #39 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Flowserve US Inc. answer due 9/30/2021. Signed by U.S. District Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 9/9/21. (SB)
September 8, 2021 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Flowserve US Inc.. (Frankenstein, Sara)
September 8, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION for Attorney Thomas D. Jensen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-3624831) by Goulds Pumps, LLC, Grinnell LLC, ITT LLC. (Steinhoff, Eric)
September 8, 2021 Filing 37 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by General Electric Company. (Schweigert, David)
September 7, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION for Attorney Heather H. Neubauer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-3624014) by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC. (Hanson, Laura)
September 7, 2021 Filing 35 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Aurora Pump Company, Crane Co., Flowserve US Inc., Foster Wheeler Corporation, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps, LLC, Grinnell LLC, ITT LLC, Powell Valves, SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Hanson, Laura)
September 2, 2021 Filing 34 Powell Valves ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Aurora Pump Company, Crane Co., Flowserve US Inc., Foster Wheeler Corporation, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps, LLC, Grinnell LLC, ITT LLC, SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Warren Pumps, LLC by Powell Valves. (Sorenson Brotten, Elizabeth)
September 2, 2021 Filing 33 The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Aurora Pump Company, Crane Co., Flowserve US Inc., Foster Wheeler Corporation, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps, LLC, Grinnell LLC, ITT LLC, Powell Valves, SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Sorenson Brotten, Elizabeth)
September 2, 2021 Filing 32 Aurora Pump Company ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Crane Co., Flowserve US Inc., Foster Wheeler Corporation, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps, LLC, Grinnell LLC, ITT LLC, Powell Valves, SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Warren Pumps, LLC by Aurora Pump Company. (Sorenson Brotten, Elizabeth)
September 2, 2021 NOTICE of Filing Error: #23 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #21 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #19 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Sorenson Brotten, Elizabeth)
September 1, 2021 Filing 31 Grinnell LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Aurora Pump Company, Crane Co., Flowserve US Inc., Foster Wheeler Corporation, General Electric Company, Powell Valves, SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Warren Pumps, LLC by Grinnell LLC. (Steinhoff, Eric)
September 1, 2021 Filing 30 Goulds Pumps, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Aurora Pump Company, Crane Co., Flowserve US Inc., Foster Wheeler Corporation, General Electric Company, Powell Valves, SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Warren Pumps, LLC by Goulds Pumps, LLC. (Steinhoff, Eric)
September 1, 2021 Filing 29 ITT LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Aurora Pump Company, Crane Co., Flowserve US Inc., Foster Wheeler Corporation, General Electric Company, Powell Valves, SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Warren Pumps, LLC by ITT LLC. (Steinhoff, Eric)
August 31, 2021 Filing 28 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Crane Co.. (Lindeman, Bradley)
August 31, 2021 Filing 27 Crane Co.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Aurora Pump Company, Flowserve US Inc., Foster Wheeler Corporation, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps, LLC, Grinnell LLC, ITT LLC, Powell Valves, SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Warren Pumps, LLC by Crane Co.. (Lindeman, Bradley)
August 31, 2021 Filing 26 SPX Cooling Technologies Inc., f/k/a Marley Cooling Technologies, Inc., f/k/a The Marley Cooling Tower Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Aurora Pump Company, Crane Co., Flowserve US Inc., Foster Wheeler Corporation, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps, LLC, Grinnell LLC, ITT LLC, Powell Valves, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Warren Pumps, LLC by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.. (Hanson, Laura)
August 30, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Attorney Jon Russell to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-3619144) by Crane Co.. (Lindeman, Bradley)
August 30, 2021 Filing 24 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Powell Valves. (Sorenson Brotten, Elizabeth)
August 30, 2021 Filing 23 (FILED IN ERROR) The William Powell Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM Answer to Cross Claims against Powell Valves by Powell Valves. (Sorenson Brotten, Elizabeth) Modified text on 9/2/2021 (JLS).
August 30, 2021 Filing 22 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company identifying Corporate Parent BlackRock, Inc. for The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Sorenson Brotten, Elizabeth)
August 30, 2021 Filing 21 (FILED IN ERROR) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM Answer to Cross Claims against The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Sorenson Brotten, Elizabeth) Modified text on 9/2/2021 (JLS).
August 30, 2021 Filing 20 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Aurora Pump Company identifying Corporate Parent SPX Corporation, Corporate Parent Pentair for Aurora Pump Company. (Sorenson Brotten, Elizabeth)
August 30, 2021 Filing 19 (FILED IN ERROR) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM Answer to Cross Claims against Aurora Pump Company by Aurora Pump Company. (Sorenson Brotten, Elizabeth) Modified text on 9/2/2021 (JLS). Modified on 9/2/2021 (SAC).
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ryan P. Phillips for Cheryl A. Rogers and for Gerald J. Rogers. Signed by U.S. District Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 8/19/21. (SB)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Richard I. Nemeroff for Cheryl A. Rogers and for Gerald J. Rogers. Signed by U.S. District Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 8/19/21. (SB)
August 17, 2021 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC (Lee, Brad)
August 17, 2021 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Powell Valves (Lee, Brad)
August 17, 2021 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Grinnell LLC (Lee, Brad)
August 17, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Goulds Pumps, LLC (Lee, Brad)
August 17, 2021 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant ITT LLC (Lee, Brad)
August 11, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc. (Lee, Brad)
August 11, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Lee, Brad)
August 11, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant General Electric Company (Lee, Brad)
August 11, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Flowserve US Inc. (Lee, Brad)
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Crane Co. (Lee, Brad)
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Foster Wheeler Corporation (Lee, Brad)
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Aurora Pump Company (Lee, Brad) Modified text on 8/11/2021 (DJP).
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney Ryan P. Phillips to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-3603605) by Cheryl A. Rogers, Gerald J. Rogers. (Lee, Brad)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney Richard L. Nemeroff to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-3603595) by Cheryl A. Rogers, Gerald J. Rogers. (Lee, Brad)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. 12 Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO 85)(SKK)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3602430, in shell case on 8/6/21 filed by Cheryl A. Rogers, Gerald J. Rogers on 8/6/21. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Pathology Report) (SKK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers et al v. Aurora Pump Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powell Valves
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Represented By: Laura J. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Bradley J. Lindeman
Represented By: Jon R. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc.
Represented By: Sara Frankenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: David D Schweigert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Thomas D. Jensen
Represented By: Eric J. Steinhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Thomas D. Jensen
Represented By: Eric J. Steinhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT LLC
Represented By: Thomas D. Jensen
Represented By: Eric J. Steinhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The William Powell Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marley Cooling Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Represented By: Laura J. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Marley Cooling Tower Company
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Represented By: Laura J. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Represented By: Laura J. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald J. Rogers
Represented By: Brad J. Lee
Represented By: Richard I. Nemeroff
Represented By: Ryan P. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl A. Rogers
Represented By: Brad J. Lee
Represented By: Richard I. Nemeroff
Represented By: Ryan P. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?