NDN Collective et al v. Retsel Corporation et al
Plaintiff: NDN Collective and Sunny Red Bear
Defendant: Retsel Corporation doing business as Grand Gateway Hotel doing business as Cheers Sports Lounge and Casino, Connie Uhre and Nicholas Uhre
Case Number: 5:2022cv05027
Filed: March 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2022 Filing 12 Amended Joint and Separate ANSWER to #4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Lindeman, Bradley) Modified Docket Entry Relationship and Docket Text on 5/9/2022 (DLC).
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 4/18/2022. (CLR)
April 15, 2022 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Retsel Corporation. (Lindeman, Bradley)
April 15, 2022 Filing 9 Joint and Separate ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Lindeman, Bradley)
April 4, 2022 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Nicholas Uhre on 3/25/2022 (Billion, Timothy)
April 4, 2022 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Retsel Corporation on 3/25/2022 (Billion, Timothy)
March 25, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Reissued as to All Defendants. (DLC)
March 24, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS(ES) by NDN Collective, Sunny Red Bear. (Johnson, Brendan)
March 24, 2022 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT . (Johnson, Brendan)
March 23, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by NDN Collective, Sunny Red Bear. (Johnson, Brendan)
March 23, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Retsel Corporation, Connie Uhre, Nicholas Uhre. 3 Summonses, a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(CLR)
March 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, $402 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3751358, in shell case on 3/23/2022 filed by Sunny Red Bear, NDN Collective on 3/23/2022. (CLR) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/23/2022) (CLR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NDN Collective et al v. Retsel Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NDN Collective
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunny Red Bear
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retsel Corporation doing business as Grand Gateway Hotel doing business as Cheers Sports Lounge and Casino
Represented By: Bradley J. Lindeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Uhre
Represented By: Bradley J. Lindeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Uhre
Represented By: Bradley J. Lindeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?