Lipsky v. Cronin et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Robert Lipsky
Defendant: Nate Cronin, Bill Wainman, Michael Close and City of Hot Springs, SD
Case Number: 5:2022cv05039
Filed: April 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act - Civil Action for Deprivation of Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2022 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Daniel Robert Lipsky. (SLT)
June 21, 2022 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendants City of Hot Springs, SD, Michael Close on 5/3/2022 (SLT)
June 21, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE by Daniel Robert Lipsky. (SLT)
May 31, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Electronically File Documents pursuant to e-filing registration request made via PACER. Pro se party Daniel Robert Lipsky will continue receiving electronic notice of unsealed documents filed in this case, but must wait for a Court ruling regarding e-filing. Refer to the CM/ECF User Manual located on the court website at www.sdd.uscourts.gov for information about accessing documents. (DJP)
May 23, 2022 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by City of Hot Springs, SD, Michael Close, Nate Cronin, Bill Wainman. (Mann, Rebecca)
May 23, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim by City of Hot Springs, SD, Michael Close, Nate Cronin, Bill Wainman. (Mann, Rebecca)
May 23, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca L. Mann on behalf of City of Hot Springs, SD, Michael Close, Nate Cronin, Bill Wainman. (Mann, Rebecca)
May 4, 2022 Filing 4 REGISTRATION for Electronic Notice by Daniel Robert Lipsky. Pro se party Daniel Robert Lipsky will now receive electronic notice of unsealed documents filed in this case. Refer to the CM/ECF User Manual located on the court website at www.sdd.uscourts.gov for information about accessing documents. (SLT)
May 2, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to City of Hot Springs, SD, Michael Close, Nate Cronin, Bill Wainman. 4 Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, a copy of Fed.R.Civ.P.4, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff via hand-delivery. (SLT)
April 26, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Complaint together with the filing fee and incorrectly completed summons(es) or no summons(es). A new case has been opened. We are unable to issue summon(es) at this time. Enclosed is a blank summons form and a sample completed summons form. Follow the enclosed instructions to properly complete your summons(es). As soon as the Clerks Office receives your properly completed summons(es), it/they will be issued. Copy of docket sheet, blank summons form, and sample completed summons form with instructions sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. A request to electronically file documents in your case must be made through the PACER Service Center at www.pacer.uscourts.gov. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed of the plaintiff's address changes, including changes to primary and secondary email addresses. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (SLT)
April 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402.00 fee paid, receipt# SDX500006878,. (Attachments: #1 Attached Exhibit on Thumb Drive located in RC Clerk's Evidence Room) (SLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lipsky v. Cronin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Robert Lipsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nate Cronin
Represented By: Rebecca L. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Wainman
Represented By: Rebecca L. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Close
Represented By: Rebecca L. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hot Springs, SD
Represented By: Rebecca L. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?