Petersen v. Rapid City, Pierre & Eastern Railroad, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kenneth W. Petersen, Jr.
Defendant: Rapid City, Pierre & Eastern Railroad, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2022cv05064
Filed: July 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, Notice, Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge served on Rapid City, Pierre & Eastern Railroad, Inc; CT Corporation System on July 27, 2022, filed by Kenneth W. Petersen, Jr. (Eiesland, Aaron)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO ADMIT NONRESIDENT ATTORNEY granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Chad M. Knight for Rapid City, Pierre & Eastern Railroad, Inc. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on August 22, 2022. (DLC)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Discovery Report Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on August 18, 2022. (DLC)
August 18, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney Chad M. Knight to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-3858108) by Rapid City, Pierre & Eastern Railroad, Inc.. (Williams, Steven)
August 18, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Rapid City, Pierre & Eastern Railroad, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Genesee & Wyoming, Inc., Corporate Parent Brookfield Asset Management, Inc. for Rapid City, Pierre & Eastern Railroad, Inc.. (Williams, Steven)
August 18, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Rapid City, Pierre & Eastern Railroad, Inc.. (Williams, Steven)
July 21, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Rapid City, Pierre & Eastern Railroad, Inc. Summons, Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85 delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO 85)(DLC) Modified Docket Text on 7/21/2022 (DLC).
July 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402.00 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3837116, in shell case on 07/20/2022 filed by Kenneth W. Petersen, Jr on 07/20/2022. (DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petersen v. Rapid City, Pierre & Eastern Railroad, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth W. Petersen, Jr.
Represented By: Aaron D. Eiesland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rapid City, Pierre & Eastern Railroad, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Thomas Williams
Represented By: Chad M. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?