Dobles v. Black Hills Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Roberto Dobles
Defendant: Black Hills Corporation, Black Hills Exploration and Production, Inc., MOC Oil Company Sucursal Costa Rica, Black Hills Gas Resources, Inc., David Emery, Linden Evans and Randy Harris
Case Number: 5:2022cv05078
Filed: September 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Black Hills Exploration and Production, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Black Hills Non-Regulated Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Black Hills Corporation for Black Hills Exploration and Production, Inc.. (Druley, Delia)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Black Hills Corporation. (Druley, Delia)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Black Hills Gas Resources, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Black Hills Exploration and Production Inc., Corporate Parent Black Hills Corporation for Black Hills Gas Resources, Inc.. (Druley, Delia)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by MOC Oil Company Sucursal Costa Rica identifying Corporate Parent Black Hills Gas Resources, Inc., Corporate Parent Black Hills Exploration and Production Inc. for MOC Oil Company Sucursal Costa Rica. (Druley, Delia)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (FILED IN ERROR) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Black Hills Corporation, Black Hills Exploration and Production, Inc., Black Hills Gas Resources, Inc., David Emery, Linden Evans, Randy Harris, MOC Oil Company Sucursal Costa Rica. (Druley, Delia) Modified on 10/20/2022 (DJP).
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Filing Error: #19 Corporate Disclosure Statement was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Druley, Delia)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jonathon D. Bergman for all Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 10/18/2022. (MSB)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jennifer S. Allen for all Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 10/18/2022. (MSB)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney Jonathon D. Bergman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-3898222) by Black Hills Corporation, Black Hills Exploration and Production, Inc., Black Hills Gas Resources, Inc., David Emery, Linden Evans, Randy Harris, MOC Oil Company Sucursal Costa Rica. (Attachments: #1 Attachment List of Defendants Attorney Jonathon D. Bergman Representing) (Druley, Delia)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney Jennifer S. Allen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-3898193) by Black Hills Corporation, Black Hills Exploration and Production, Inc., Black Hills Gas Resources, Inc., David Emery, Linden Evans, Randy Harris, MOC Oil Company Sucursal Costa Rica. (Attachments: #1 Attachment List of Defendants Attorney Jennifer Allen Representing) (Druley, Delia)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jason B. Wesoky for Roberto Dobles. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 10/14/2022. (JLS)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney Jason Wesoky to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-3894332) by Roberto Dobles. (Quaintance, John)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Black Hills Corporation answer due 11/23/2022; Black Hills Exploration and Production, Inc. answer due 11/23/2022; Black Hills Gas Resources, Inc. answer due 11/23/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 10/6/2022. (CLR)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Black Hills Corporation, Black Hills Exploration and Production, Inc., Black Hills Gas Resources, Inc., David Emery, Linden Evans, Randy Harris, MOC Oil Company Sucursal Costa Rica. (Druley, Delia)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin E. Evans on behalf of All Defendants. (Evans, Edwin)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Delia M. Druley on behalf of All Defendants. (Druley, Delia)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 MOTION to Extend Deadlines Serve Summons and Complaint Defendant MOC Oil Company. New deadline to serve the Complaint and Jury Demand is October 29, 2022 Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 09/30/2022. (KLE) Modified on 10/3/2022 to edit text (KLE).
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons served on Cole Stender, process clerk for registered agent of Black Hills Gas Resources, Inc. on 9/15/2022, filed by Roberto Dobles. (Quaintance, John)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons served on Amy Koenig for Black Hills Exploration and Production LLC on 9/16/2022, filed by Roberto Dobles. (Quaintance, John)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons served on Amy Knoenig for Black Hills Corporation on 9/16/2022, filed by Roberto Dobles. (Quaintance, John)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Extend Deadlines Serve Summons and Complaint Defendant MOC Oil Company by Roberto Dobles. (Ogborn, Michael)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. 7 Summons(es) delivered via electronic delivery to counsel. CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SKK)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Roberto Dobles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Randy Harris, #2 Proposed Summons Moc Oil Company Sucursal Costa Rica, #3 Proposed Summons Linden Evans, #4 Proposed Summons David Emery, #5 Proposed Summons Black Hills Gas Resources, Inc., #6 Proposed Summons Black Hills Exploration and Production, Inc., #7 Proposed Summons Black Hills Corporation)(Quaintance, John)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3871169, in shell case on 09/07/2022 filed by Roberto Dobles on 09/07/2022. (KLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dobles v. Black Hills Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Dobles
Represented By: John C. Quaintance
Represented By: Michael Jon Ogborn
Represented By: Jason B. Wesoky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Hills Corporation
Represented By: Delia M. Druley
Represented By: Edwin E. Evans
Represented By: Jennifer S. Allen
Represented By: Jonathon D. Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Hills Exploration and Production, Inc.
Represented By: Delia M. Druley
Represented By: Edwin E. Evans
Represented By: Jennifer S. Allen
Represented By: Jonathon D. Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOC Oil Company Sucursal Costa Rica
Represented By: Delia M. Druley
Represented By: Edwin E. Evans
Represented By: Jennifer S. Allen
Represented By: Jonathon D. Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Hills Gas Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Delia M. Druley
Represented By: Edwin E. Evans
Represented By: Jennifer S. Allen
Represented By: Jonathon D. Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Emery
Represented By: Delia M. Druley
Represented By: Edwin E. Evans
Represented By: Jennifer S. Allen
Represented By: Jonathon D. Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linden Evans
Represented By: Delia M. Druley
Represented By: Edwin E. Evans
Represented By: Jennifer S. Allen
Represented By: Jonathon D. Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Harris
Represented By: Delia M. Druley
Represented By: Edwin E. Evans
Represented By: Jennifer S. Allen
Represented By: Jonathon D. Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?