Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company v. Firefly Builders, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Firefly Builders, Inc., Wayne Koistinen, Roseanne Koistinen and Larry Koistinen
Case Number: 5:2022cv05079
Filed: September 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Mail sent to Roseanne Koistinen was returned as undeliverable. #12 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction was returned. Re-Mailing via Certified Mail dkt 12 to 10915 Summercreek Lane Belle Fourche, SD 57717 as listed in summons (dkt 7 ) for Roseanne Koistinen (VMM)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Mail sent to Larry Koistinen was returned as undeliverable. #12 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction was returned. Re-Mailing via Certified Mail dkt 12 to 10915 Summercreek Lane Belle Fourche, SD 57717 as listed in summons (dkt 7 ) for Larry Koistinen. (VMM)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Mail sent to Wayne Koistinen was returned as undeliverable. #12 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction was returned. Re-Mailing via Certified Mail dkt #12 to 10915 Summercreek Lane Belle Fourche, SD 57717 as listed in summons (dkt #7 ) for Wayne Koistinen. (VMM)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPINION AND ORDER granting #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 10/18/2022. Mailed Order via Certified Mail to address listed in the Return of Service (Dkts 8-11) for all defendants. (VMM)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Larry Koistinen on September 12, 2022 (Meadors, Robert)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Roseanne Koistinen on September 12, 2022 (Meadors, Robert)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Wayne Koistinen on September 12, 2022 (Meadors, Robert)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Firefly Builders, Inc. on September 12, 2022 (Meadors, Robert)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. 4 Summons(es) delivered via electronic delivery to counsel. CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SAC)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Indemnity Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Demand Letters) (Meadors, Robert)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Indemnity Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Demand Letters, #3 Exhibit 3 - Payment Bond 3571, #4 Exhibit 4 - Payment Bond 3570) (Meadors, Robert)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company. (Meadors, Robert)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company. (Meadors, Robert)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company. (Meadors, Robert)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT, $402 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3872494, in shell case on 9/9/2022 filed by Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company on 9/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Indemnity Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Demand Letters) (SLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company v. Firefly Builders, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert L. Meadors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firefly Builders, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Koistinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roseanne Koistinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Koistinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?