Schoon v. The Travelers Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Destiny Schoon
Defendant: The Travelers Companies, Inc., Farmington Casualty Company, Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc., News Corporation and News America Marketing In-Store Services, LLC
Case Number: 5:2023cv05007
Filed: February 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles B Kornmann
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2023 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #13 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim Affidavit of Brad J. Lee filed by Destiny Schoon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Form 5500 - 2021 Annual Return/Report of Employee Benefit Plan - Travelers Companies, Inc., #2 Exhibit B: Form 5500 Searches - Farmington Casualty Company, #3 Exhibit C: AM Best Rating Services - Farmington Casualty Company, #4 Exhibit D: 2022 Annual Statement - Farmington Casualty Company, #5 Exhibit E: 2021 Annual Report - Farmington Casualty Company) (Lee, Brad)
April 5, 2023 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Destiny Schoon. (Lee, Brad)
March 28, 2023 Filing 21 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by News America Marketing In-Store Services, LLC. (Ayers, Deanne)
March 20, 2023 Filing 20 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Farmington Casualty Company identifying Other Affiliate Travelers Casualty and Surety Company for Farmington Casualty Company. (Ayers, Deanne)
March 20, 2023 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Farmington Casualty Company. (Ayers, Deanne)
March 20, 2023 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by News America Marketing In-Store Services, LLC. (Ayers, Deanne)
March 20, 2023 Filing 17 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. for Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.. (Ayers, Deanne)
March 20, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.. (Ayers, Deanne)
March 20, 2023 Filing 15 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by The Travelers Companies, Inc.. (Ayers, Deanne)
March 20, 2023 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by The Travelers Companies, Inc.. (Ayers, Deanne)
March 20, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim by The Travelers Companies, Inc.. (Ayers, Deanne)
March 10, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Farmington Casualty Company . (Ayers, Deanne)
March 10, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by The Travelers Companies, Inc. . (Ayers, Deanne)
March 6, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by News America Marketing In-Store Services, LLC . (Ayers, Deanne)
March 6, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by News Corporation . (Ayers, Deanne)
March 6, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. . (Ayers, Deanne)
February 28, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Destiny Schoon. Farmington Casualty Company served on 2/22/2023, answer due 3/15/2023. (Lee, Brad)
February 28, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Destiny Schoon. The Travelers Companies, Inc. served on 2/22/2023, answer due 3/15/2023. (Lee, Brad)
February 17, 2023 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant News Corporation on 2/13/23 (Lee, Brad)
February 17, 2023 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant News America Marketing In-Store Services, LLC on 2/13/23 (Lee, Brad)
February 17, 2023 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. on 2/13/23 (Lee, Brad)
February 10, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Farmington Casualty Company, Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc., News America Marketing In-Store Services, LLC, News Corporation, The Travelers Companies, Inc.. 5 Summonses delivered via electronic delivery to counsel. CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JLS)
February 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402.00 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3968309, in shell case on 2/10/2023 filed by Destiny Schoon on 2/10/2023. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schoon v. The Travelers Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Destiny Schoon
Represented By: Brad J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Deanne C. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmington Casualty Company
Represented By: Deanne C. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.
Represented By: Deanne C. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: News Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: News America Marketing In-Store Services, LLC
Represented By: Deanne C. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?