Hofer et al v. Progressive Home et al
Plaintiff: Dale Hofer and Paulette Hofer
Defendant: Progressive Home, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company and American Strategic Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 5:2023cv05085
Filed: December 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2024 Filing 15 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Progressive Home. (Hanson, Laura)
February 2, 2024 Filing 14 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate The Progressive Corporation, Other Affiliate Progressive Agency Holdings, Inc. for Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Hanson, Laura)
February 2, 2024 Filing 13 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by American Strategic Insurance Corporation identifying Other Affiliate The Progressive Corporation, Other Affiliate ARX Holding Corp. for American Strategic Insurance Corporation. (Hanson, Laura)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Discovery Report. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 1/31/2024. (CLR)
January 31, 2024 Filing 11 Separate ANSWER to #1 Plaintiffs' Complaint by Progressive Home. (Hanson, Laura)
January 31, 2024 Filing 10 Separate ANSWER to #1 Plaintiffs' Complaint by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Hanson, Laura)
January 31, 2024 Filing 9 Separate ANSWER to #1 Plaintiffs' Complaint by American Strategic Insurance Corporation. (Hanson, Laura)
January 31, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE (Corporate Disclosure Statement not filed). D.S.D. Civ. L.R. 7.1.1 requires non-governmental organizational parties or intervenors to file either a Corporate Disclosure Statement or a Certificate that Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 is not applicable within 14 days of the party or intervenors first pleading or entry of appearance. The deadline has passed and American Strategic Insurance Corporation, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company and Progressive Home have not complied. Said parties have three business days to comply. Compliance may be achieved by docketing the statement or certificate in CM/ECF using the Corporate Disclosure Statement or Certificate of Non-Applicability event. (RRB)
January 16, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by American Strategic Insurance Corporation, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Home to Plaintiffs' Complaint. (Hanson, Laura)
January 16, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura J. Hanson on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corporation, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Home. (Hanson, Laura)
December 18, 2023 Filing 5 ADMISSION of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Progressive Home and Progressive Casualty Insurance Company on 12/11/2023, filed by Dale Hofer. (Abourezk, Michael)
December 18, 2023 Filing 4 ADMISSION of Service of Summons and Compaint served on American Strategic Insurance Corporation on 12/11/2023, filed by Dale Hofer. (Abourezk, Michael)
December 18, 2023 Filing 3 [FILED IN ERROR] ADMISSION of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Progressive Home and Progressive Casualty Insurance Company on 12/11/2023, filed by Dale Hofer. (Abourezk, Michael) Modified on 12/18/2023 to add text (KLE).
December 18, 2023 NOTICE of Filing Error: #3 Admission of Service was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Abourezk, Michael)
December 6, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to American Strategic Insurance Corporation, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Home. 2 Summons(es) delivered via electronic delivery to counsel.. CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SLT)
December 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $405 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-4176466, in shell case on 12/6/2023 filed by Dale Hofer, Paulette Hofer. (SLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hofer et al v. Progressive Home et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Hofer
Represented By: Michael C. Abourezk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulette Hofer
Represented By: Michael C. Abourezk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Home
Represented By: Laura J. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura J. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Laura J. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?