WB Construction and Son's, Inc. v. Panhandle Geotechnical & Enviromental, Inc. et al
Defendant: Panhandle Geotechnical & Enviromental, Inc., Michael Olsen and Melgaard Construction Company, Inc.
Counter Defendant: WB Construction and Son's, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2024cv05001
Filed: January 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2024 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 with Jury Demand by Michael Olsen, Panhandle Geotechnical & Enviromental, Inc.. (Collins, Jeffery)
February 20, 2024 Filing 17 Answer to #15 Counterclaim filed by WB Construction and Son's, Inc.. (Smiley, Jason) Modified text on 2/21/2024 (SLW).
February 14, 2024 Filing 16 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Melgaard Construction Company, Inc.. (McGrath, Ryan)
February 8, 2024 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against WB Construction and Son's, Inc. by Melgaard Construction Company, Inc.. (McGrath, Ryan)
February 5, 2024 Filing 14 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Panhandle Geotechnical & Enviromental, Inc.. (Collins, Jeffery)
February 5, 2024 Filing 13 CITIZENSHIP Disclosure Statement in Diversity Case re Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Michael Olsen, Panhandle Geotechnical & Enviromental, Inc.. (Collins, Jeffery)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint . Panhandle Geotechnical & Enviromental, Inc. answer due 1/30/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 1/30/2024. (SAC)
January 29, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Josey Blare on behalf of Michael Olsen, Panhandle Geotechnical & Enviromental, Inc.. (Blare, Josey)
January 29, 2024 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Michael Olsen, Panhandle Geotechnical & Enviromental, Inc.. (Collins, Jeffery)
January 29, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffery D. Collins on behalf of Michael Olsen, Panhandle Geotechnical & Enviromental, Inc.. (Collins, Jeffery)
January 29, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Williams on behalf of WB Construction and Son's, Inc.. (Williams, Richard)
January 23, 2024 Filing 7 ADMISSION of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Melgaard Construction Company, Inc. on January 22, 2024, filed by WB Construction and Son's, Inc.. (Smiley, Jason)
January 23, 2024 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Michael Olsen on January 10, 2024 (Smiley, Jason)
January 23, 2024 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Panhandle Geotechnical & Enviromental, Inc. on January 10, 2024 (Smiley, Jason)
January 22, 2024 Filing 4 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by WB Construction and Son's, Inc.. (Smiley, Jason)
January 22, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE (Corporate Disclosure Statement not filed). D.S.D. Civ. L.R. 7.1.1 requires non-governmental organizational parties or intervenors to file either a Corporate Disclosure Statement or a Certificate that Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 is not applicable within 14 days of the party or intervenors first pleading or entry of appearance. The deadline has passed and WB Construction and Son's, Inc. has not complied. Said party has three business days to comply. Compliance may be achieved by docketing the statement or certificate in CM/ECF using the Corporate Disclosure Statement or Certificate of Non-Applicability event. (RRB)
January 5, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Melgaard Construction Company, Inc., Michael Olsen, Panhandle Geotechnical & Enviromental, Inc. 3 Summons(es) delivered via electronic delivery to counsel. CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SAC)
January 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $405 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-4193212, in shell case on 1/4/2024 filed by WB Construction and Son's, Inc. (SAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WB Construction and Son's, Inc. v. Panhandle Geotechnical & Enviromental, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: WB Construction and Son's, Inc.
Represented By: Jason M. Smiley
Represented By: Richard M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panhandle Geotechnical & Enviromental, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffery D. Collins
Represented By: Josey Blare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Olsen
Represented By: Jeffery D. Collins
Represented By: Josey Blare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melgaard Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan W. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?