Russell v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC

Plaintiff: James Russell
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00188
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Chattanooga Office
County: McMinn
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Harry S Mattice
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AGREED ORDER TO PRODUCE MEDICAL, HOSPITAL AND EMPLOYMENT RECORDS; granting #12 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 10/5/18. (KFB, )
October 4, 2018 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Allow Defendant access to Plaintiff's Medical, Hospital and Employment Records by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Agreed Order to Produce Medical, Hospital and Employment Records)(Flores, Federico)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/12/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr.. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/28/2019 04:00 PM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr. Dispositive Motions due by 7/30/2018.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 9/10/18. (KFB, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Woodfin, Clint)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 08/20/2018. (KLWa, )
August 16, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Flores, Federico)
August 16, 2018 Filing 7 (Case at Issue) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge (KFB, )
August 15, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.(Woodfin, Clint)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 08/15/2018. (CAT)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 08/15/2018. (CAT)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 08/15/2018. (CAT)
August 15, 2018 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (AMP)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Woodfin, Clint)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from McMinn County Circuit, case number 2018-cv-229. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3743871), filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Woodfin, Clint)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Russell
Represented By: D Mitchell Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Clint J Woodfin
Represented By: Federico A Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?