King et al v. City of South Pittsburg, Tennessee et. al. (JRG3)
Plaintiff: Gary Michael King and Elizabeth King
Defendant: South Pittsburg, City of, Jeremy Zimmerman, Robert Simpson, Joshua Chance, Mayor Virgil Holder, Virgil Holder and City of South Pittsburg, Tennessee
Case Number: 1:2018cv00275
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 21 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Spaulding, Reid)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William Conrad Mazzota on behalf of Jeremy Zimmerman as Member of the South Pittsburg Police Department and Jeremy Zimmerman Individually. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 12/28/2018. (KRS, ) Modified on 1/2/2019 (BJL, ).*Mailed to William Concrad Mazzota.
December 19, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Robert Simpson(individually) (Spaulding, Reid)
December 19, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeremy Zimmerman(Member of the South Pittsburg Police Department), Jeremy Zimmerman(individually). (BDG, )
December 19, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Jeremy Zimmerman as to Jeremy Zimmerman(Member of the South Pittsburg Police Department), Jeremy Zimmerman(individually). (BDG, )
December 9, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Adam Izell on behalf of Joshua Chance (Member of the South Pittsburg Police Department), Joshua Chance (individually) (Izell, W.)
December 9, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Joshua Chance (Member of the South Pittsburg Police Department), Joshua Chance (individually).(Izell, W.)
November 27, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Jeremy Zimmerman(Member of the South Pittsburg Police Department).(Berexa, Kristin)
November 26, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by City of South Pittsburg, Tennessee, Virgil Holder.(Wells, Ronald)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiffs' counsel for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent/Nonconsent)(JCK)
November 21, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Robert Simpson(individually).(Spaulding, Reid)
November 21, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Reid A Spaulding on behalf of Robert Simpson(individually) (Spaulding, Reid)
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 Certificate of Corporate Interest by City of South Pittsburg, Tennessee, Virgil Holder. (Wells, Ronald)
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 Administrative Notice to Counsel #8 Supplement :Wrong event used. Requirements due by 11/21/2018. (BDG, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT Disclosure Statement by City of South Pittsburg, Tennessee, Virgil Holder. (Wells, Ronald)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 Administrative Notice to Counsel requirements due by 11/20/2018. (SAC, ) Modified on 11/15/2018, mailed to Philip Aaron Wells along with Orders 4,5,6. (SAC, ).
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/15/2018. (SAC, )
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/15/2018. (SAC, )
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/15/2018. (SAC, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal by Virgil Holder, South Pittsburg, City of. (Attachments: #1 Other Complete style of case, #2 Other List of Defense Attorneys)(Wells, Ronald)
November 15, 2018 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (SAC, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel. (SAC, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Circuit Court, case number 22038. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3817406), filed by South Pittsburg, City of, Virgil Holder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Documents)(Wells, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King et al v. City of South Pittsburg, Tennessee et. al. (JRG3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Pittsburg, City of
Represented By: Ronald D Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Zimmerman
Represented By: W Gerald Tidwell, Jr
Represented By: William Concrad Mazzota
Represented By: Kristin E Berexa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Simpson
Represented By: Reid A Spaulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Chance
Represented By: W. Adam Izell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Virgil Holder
Represented By: Ronald D Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virgil Holder
Represented By: Ronald D Wells
Represented By: Philip Aaron Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of South Pittsburg, Tennessee
Represented By: Ronald D Wells
Represented By: Philip Aaron Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Michael King
Represented By: Andrew Peters Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth King
Represented By: Andrew Peters Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?