Wagner v. T.D.O.C.
Plaintiff: Anthony C Wagner
Defendant: Tony Parker, Brett Cobble, Lee Dotson, T.D.O.C. and Shawn Phillips
Case Number: 1:2020cv00160
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #5 DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION and denying #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Anthony C Wagner. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/28/2020. (AWS) Mailed to Anthony Wagner.
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from Anthony Wagner. (AWS)
July 6, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Shawn Phillips and forwarded to the Marshal for service. (ABF)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Anthony C Wagner. (ABF)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Plaintiff is ASSESSED the civil filing fee of $350.00. The custodian of Plaintiff's inmate trust account is DIRECTED to submit the filing fee to the Clerk in the manner set forth. This action will only proceed as to Plaintiffs claim for injunctive relief against Defendant Warden Phillips arising out of his allegation that Defendant Warden Phillips is enforcing a discriminatory policy that charges Plaintiff for therapeutic meals that he does not receive in violation of Plaintiffs Equal Protection rights. Accordingly, all other claims and Defendants are DISMISSED. Plaintiff is ORDERED to complete the service packet and return it to the Clerks Office within twenty (20) days of receipt of this order. Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 6/23/20. (c/m Anthony C Wagner #283940 BLEDSOE COUNTY CORRECTIONAL COMPLEX 1045 HORSEHEAD ROAD PIKEVILLE, TN 37367 with service packets and custodian of inmate accounts and Attorney General for the State of Tennessee) (ADA)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Anthony C Wagner. (ADA)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against T.D.O.C., Tony Parker, Lee Dotson, Shawn Phillips, and Brett Cobble, filed by Anthony C Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter & envelope)(ADA)
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (AWS)Mailed Clerk's Response, blank Complaint Form, and Pro Se Instructions to Anthony Wagner.
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (AWS) Mailed to Anthony Wagner.
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony C Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(AWS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagner v. T.D.O.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Cobble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Dotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.D.O.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony C Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?