Raudenbush, III v. Taylor et al
Plaintiff: George Joseph Raudenbush, III
Defendant: Kevin Hampton, Misty Hardin, Centurion, Centurion Managed Care, Correctional Systems Healthcare, Clement Bernard, Chance, Centene Corporation, Misty Gregg, Jesse Gregg, Randy Lee, William Hampton, MHM Services, Inc., Harold Angel, Sharon C Taylor and Lewis
Case Number: 2:2014cv00295
Filed: September 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Greeneville Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: MJ Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2018 Filing 106 MANDATE of USCA as to #100 Notice of Appeal filed by George Joseph Raudenbush, III. Pursuant to the court's disposition that was filed 07/12/2018 the mandate for this case hereby issues today. COSTS: None. (AMP)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER of USCA as to #100 Notice of Appeal filed by George Joseph Raudenbush, III. Accordingly, we AFFIRM the district court's judgment. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter - Mandate to issue) (AMP)
May 3, 2018 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L Brenner on behalf of Harold Angel, Chance, Jesse Gregg, Kevin Hampton, Misty Hardin, Randy Lee, Sharon C Taylor (Brenner, Jennifer)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #102 Motion to Waive Pacer Costs. This exemption is valid as of the date of this order, and may be revoked at the discretion of the Court at any time. The Clerk of the Court is hereby DIRECTED to provide a copy of this order to the PACER Service Center. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/22/2017. (Copy of Order mailed to George Raudenbush and PACER Service Center at P.O. Box 780549, San Antonio, TX 78278) (AMP)
September 27, 2017 Filing 102 MOTION to Waive Pacer Costs by George Joseph Raudenbush, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AMP)
September 13, 2017 Filing 101 USCA Case Number is 17-6068 for #100 Notice of Appeal filed by George Joseph Raudenbush, III. The case manager is Michelle Davis. (AMP)
September 11, 2017 Filing 100 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #99 Judgment, by George Joseph Raudenbush, III. Filing fee NOT PAID (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCK)
August 14, 2017 Filing 99 JUDGMENT re #98 Memorandum Opinion and Order. For the reasons stated in the Order filed herewith, It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to all defendants. Entered by Debra C. Poplin, Clerk of Court on 8/14/2017 (JCK)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The defendants' motion for summary judgment as to the 1983 claim is GRANTED... The defendants' Motion to Ascertain Status of Summary Judgment, [Doc. 90], is DENIED as moot. The defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of prosecution, [Doc. 91], is DENIED as moot. See Memorandum Opinion and Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/14/2017. (JCK)
August 8, 2017 Filing 97 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Sharon Taylor by Harold Angel, Chance, Jesse Gregg, Kevin Hampton, Misty Hardin, Randy Lee, Sharon C Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Obituary of Sharon Taylor)(Fuller, Eric)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER: The trial in this matter, currently set for August 15, 2017, is hereby CANCELLED pending the resolution of the pending motion for summary judgment and other related motions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/8/2017. (JCK)
August 1, 2017 Filing 95 AMENDED DOCUMENT by George Joseph Raudenbush, III. Amendment to #94 Response in Opposition to Motion . (Edmiston, Keith)
July 31, 2017 Filing 94 RESPONSE in Opposition re #91 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution filed by George Joseph Raudenbush, III. (Edmiston, Keith)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Final Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for July 25, 2017, is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/20/2017. (JCK)
July 18, 2017 Filing 92 PROPOSED PRETRIAL ORDER by George Joseph Raudenbush, III. (Edmiston, Keith)
July 10, 2017 Filing 91 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution by Harold Angel, Chance, Jesse Gregg, Kevin Hampton, Misty Hardin, Randy Lee, Sharon C Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A - email of 3-24-17, #2 Exhibit Exh B - email of 4-4-17, #3 Exhibit Exh C- Defendants witness and exhibit lists of 4-4-17)(Fuller, Eric)
May 10, 2017 Filing 90 MOTION Motion to Ascertain Status of Summary Judgment Motion re #79 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Harold Angel, Chance, Jesse Gregg, Kevin Hampton, Misty Hardin, Randy Lee, Sharon C Taylor. (Fuller, Eric)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Granting re #88 MOTION to Continue Trial Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/25/2017 at 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 8/15/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 420 - Greeneville before District Judge J Ronnie Greer. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 4/5/2017. (JCK)
March 28, 2017 Filing 88 MOTION to Continue Trial by Harold Angel, Chance, Jesse Gregg, Kevin Hampton, Misty Hardin, Randy Lee, Sharon C Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of counsel and military orders)(Fuller, Eric)
January 6, 2017 Filing 87 RESPONSE to Statement of Material Facts re #81 Statement of Material Facts filed by George Joseph Raudenbush, III. (Edmiston, Keith)
January 6, 2017 Filing 86 RESPONSE to Motion re #79 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by George Joseph Raudenbush, III. (Edmiston, Keith)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #84 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #79 MOTION for Summary Judgment . The plaintiff has filed a Motion [Doc. 84], which the defendants do not oppose, to extend the deadline for responding to the defendants' motion for summary judgment to January 6, 2017. The Motion is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 12/08/2016. (AMP)
December 7, 2016 Filing 84 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by George Joseph Raudenbush, III. (Edmiston, Keith)
December 2, 2016 Filing 83 SUPPLEMENT to #80 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, Resubmission of Exhibit 1, Deposition of Plaintiff George Raudenbush by Harold Angel, Chance, Jesse Gregg, Kevin Hampton, Misty Hardin, Randy Lee, Sharon C Taylor. (Fuller, Eric)
November 28, 2016 Filing 82 Administrative Notice to Counsel #80 Memorandum in Support of Motion. Requirements due by 12/5/2016. (AMP)
November 27, 2016 Filing 81 STATEMENT of Material Facts re #79 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Harold Angel, Chance, Jesse Gregg, Kevin Hampton, Misty Hardin, Randy Lee, Sharon C Taylor. (Fuller, Eric)
November 27, 2016 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #79 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Harold Angel, Chance, Jesse Gregg, Kevin Hampton, Misty Hardin, Randy Lee, Sharon C Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff Raudenbush Deposition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Raudenbush Deposition, #3 Exhibit Jesse Gregg Deposition, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Jesse Gregg Deposition, #5 Exhibit McCracken Deposition, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to McCracken Deposition, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to McCracken Deposition, #8 Exhibit Misty Gregg Deposition, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Misty Gregg Deposition)(Fuller, Eric)
November 27, 2016 Filing 79 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Harold Angel, Chance, Jesse Gregg, Kevin Hampton, Misty Hardin, Randy Lee, Sharon C Taylor. (Fuller, Eric)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #77 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion filed by Sharon C Taylor, Kevin Hampton, Jesse Gregg, Randy Lee, Chance, Misty Hardin, Harold Angel. Before the Court is Defendants' motion to extend the deadline for the filing of dispositive motions. [Doc. 77]. The Court finds the motion was made with good cause, and for the reasons stated therein, the motion is GRANTED. Defendants have a new dispositive motion deadline of November 28, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 11/15/2016. (AMP)
November 14, 2016 Filing 77 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by Harold Angel, Chance, Jesse Gregg, Kevin Hampton, Misty Hardin, Randy Lee, Sharon C Taylor. (Fuller, Eric)
October 19, 2016 Filing 76 REPORT of Mediation (Leibowitz, Lawrence)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall show cause on or before November 2, 2016. Show Cause Response due by 11/2/2016. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 10/19/2016. (RLC, )
July 19, 2016 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith L Edmiston on behalf of George Joseph Raudenbush, III (Edmiston, Keith)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER: adopting Report and Recommendations re #68 Report and Recommendations; denying #56 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying #59 Motion to Amend/Correct. See order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/18/2016. (RLC, )
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER: This Court FINDS that the parties have not shown that the case is not suitable for mediation. Thus, pursuant to LR16.4 of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee, it is hereby ORDERED that this case proceed to mediation within the next sixty (60) days. The parties shall report on the results of mediation on or before September 30, 2016. All existing deadlines, the final pretrial conference, and the trial of this cause REMAIN as previously scheduled. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/13/2016. (RLC, )
July 13, 2016 Filing 71 UTILIZATION of Mediation (Fuller, Eric)
July 13, 2016 Filing 70 Administrative Notice to Counsel #69 Status Report : requirements due by 7/18/2016. (RLC, )
July 12, 2016 Filing 69 STATUS REPORT as to Potential Utilization of ADR/Mediation by Harold Angel, Chance, Jesse Gregg, Kevin Hampton, Misty Hardin, Randy Lee, Sharon C Taylor. (Fuller, Eric)
June 30, 2016 Filing 68 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #59 Amended MOTION to Amend/Revise #56 First MOTION to Amend/Revise #9 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, Second Amended Complaint filed by George Joseph Raudenbush, III, #56 First MOTION to Amend/Revise #9 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, Second Amended Complaint filed by George Joseph Raudenbush, III. Accordingly, the undersigned RECOMMENDS that the Motion to Amend be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 6/30/2016. (LMC)
June 3, 2016 Filing 67 WITNESS LIST Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures by Harold Angel, Chance, Jesse Gregg, Kevin Hampton, Misty Hardin, Randy Lee, Sharon C Taylor. (Fuller, Eric)
May 13, 2016 Filing 66 STATUS REPORT Jointly Filed by Harold Angel, Chance, Jesse Gregg, Kevin Hampton, Misty Hardin, Randy Lee, Sharon C Taylor. (Fuller, Eric)
May 13, 2016 Filing 65 RESPONSE in Opposition re #59 Amended MOTION to Amend/Revise #56 First MOTION to Amend/Revise #9 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, Second Amended Complaint , #56 First MOTION to Amend/Revise #9 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, Second Amended Complaint filed by Harold Angel, Chance, Jesse Gregg, Kevin Hampton, Misty Hardin, Randy Lee, Sharon C Taylor. (Fuller, Eric)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re #62 Joint MOTION Extend time to disclose expert witnessess is DENIED. Re #63 Status Report filed by George Joseph Raudenbush, III. Because the status report does not comply with the Courts scheduling order requirements, it is hereby ORDERED that the Joint Status Report, [Doc. 63], is STRICKEN. The parties are required to file a status report that complies with the Courts order. (Status Report due by 5/16/2016.) See order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 5/11/2016. (RLC, )
May 10, 2016 Filing 63 STATUS REPORT Joint by George Joseph Raudenbush, III. (Cambron, Kimberly)
May 10, 2016 Filing 62 Joint MOTION Extend time to disclose expert witnessess by George Joseph Raudenbush, III. (Attachments: #1 Other Agreed Order)(Cambron, Kimberly)
April 28, 2016 Filing 61 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by George Joseph Raudenbush, III. (Cambron, Kimberly)
April 26, 2016 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #59 Amended MOTION to Amend/Revise #56 First MOTION to Amend/Revise #9 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, Second Amended Complaint , #56 First MOTION to Amend/Revise #9 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, Second Amended Complaint filed by George Joseph Raudenbush, III. (Cambron, Kimberly)
April 26, 2016 Filing 59 Amended MOTION to Amend/Revise #56 First MOTION to Amend/Revise #9 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, Second Amended Complaint by George Joseph Raudenbush, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Socond Amended Complaint)(Cambron, Kimberly)
April 14, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 4/28/2016. See Doc. #58 . (RLC, )
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #41 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying #48 Motion for Reconsideration. The parties are hereby put on notice that the Court is considering granting dismissal of the 1983 claim of the named defendants in their official capacities. Parties shall show cause within fourteen (14) days of entry of this order why the Court should not dismiss the 1983 claim against the named employees in their official capacities. See order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 4/14/2016. (RLC, )
April 12, 2016 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #56 First MOTION to Amend/Revise #9 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, Second Amended Complaint filed by George Joseph Raudenbush, III. (Cambron, Kimberly)
April 12, 2016 Filing 56 First MOTION to Amend/Revise #9 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, Second Amended Complaint by George Joseph Raudenbush, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proposes 2nd Amended Complaint)(Cambron, Kimberly)
February 22, 2016 Filing 55 Administrative Notice to Counsel #54 Pretrial Disclosure : Informational Only (RLC, )
February 22, 2016 Filing 54 PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE by George Joseph Raudenbush, III.(Cambron, Kimberly)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #52 Motion to Withdraw Motion to Dismiss. Counsel for the defendants has determined that the portion of the motion seeking dismissal due to plaintiff's failure to exhaust administrative remedies lacks sufficient facts to support dismissal on that ground. The Motion to partially withdraw the motion to dismiss as to that basis is GRANTED. the motion to dismiss remains viable as to the ground of immunity of state employees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 2/5/2016. (LMC)
February 4, 2016 Filing 52 MOTION to Withdraw #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Harold Angel, Chance, Jesse Gregg, Kevin Hampton, Misty Hardin, Randy Lee, Sharon C Taylor. (Fuller, Eric)
February 3, 2016 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Andrew Fuller on behalf of Harold Angel, Chance, Jesse Gregg, Kevin Hampton, Misty Hardin, Randy Lee, Sharon C Taylor (Fuller, Eric)
January 26, 2016 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re #48 MOTION for Reconsideration re #38 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion for Hearing,,,,,,,, filed by Clement Bernard, Centene Corporation, Centurion, MHM Services, Inc.. (Street, Kelly)
January 13, 2016 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #48 MOTION for Reconsideration re #38 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion for Hearing,,,,,,,, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Cambron, Kimberly)
January 13, 2016 Filing 48 MOTION for Reconsideration re #38 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion for Hearing,,,,,,,, by George Joseph Raudenbush, III. (Cambron, Kimberly)
December 14, 2015 Filing 47 RESPONSE to Motion re #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by George Joseph Raudenbush, III. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Cambron, Kimberly)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/7/2015. (RLC, )
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SCHEDULING ORDER:( Jury Trial set for 6/6/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 420 - Greeneville before District Judge J Ronnie Greer. Expected length of trial is 2 days. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 420 - Greeneville.), ( Status Report due by 5/10/2016.) Dispositive Motions due by 11/8/2016. Utilization of Mediation due by 7/12/2016.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/7/2015. (RLC, )
December 6, 2015 Filing 44 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Collective Exhibit A - Plaintiff's theory of case, #2 Exhibit Collective Exhibit A -Defendant's theory of case)(Cambron, Kimberly)
November 23, 2015 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Harold Angel, Chance, Jesse Gregg, Kevin Hampton, Randy Lee, Sharon C Taylor. (Crownover, Arthur)
November 23, 2015 Filing 42 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Affidavit of Sherrie Douthitt filed by Harold Angel, Jesse Gregg, Kevin Hampton, Randy Lee, Sharon C Taylor. (Crownover, Arthur)
November 23, 2015 Filing 41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Harold Angel, Chance, Jesse Gregg, Kevin Hampton, Randy Lee, Sharon C Taylor. (Crownover, Arthur)
October 27, 2015 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Hope Cambron on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cambron, Kimberly)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: Effective March 1, 2013, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of inperson or telephonic scheduling conferences. It is therefore ORDERED: See order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 10/26/2015. (RLC, )
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: granting #29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting #37 Motion for Hearing; granting #20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting #22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting #25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. See order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 9/30/2015. (RLC, )
July 6, 2015 Filing 37 Joint MOTION for Hearing by Clement Bernard, Centene Corporation, MHM Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Granting Motion)(Street, Kelly)
June 12, 2015 Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. Magistrate Judge Dennis H Inman no longer assigned to case. SO-15-03 signed by Chief United States District Judge Varlan. (RET)
March 24, 2015 Filing 36 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Harold Angel, Chance, Jesse Gregg, Kevin Hampton, Misty Hardin, Randy Lee.(Crownover, Arthur)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis H Inman on 2/20/2015. (RLC, )
February 19, 2015 Filing 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Kevin Hampton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope used to mail document)(AMP)
February 19, 2015 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Misty Hardin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope used to mail document) (AMP)
February 19, 2015 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Randy Lee. (Attachments: #1 Envelope used to mail document) (AMP)
February 19, 2015 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Jesse Gregg. (Attachments: #1 Envelope used to mail document) (AMP)
February 19, 2015 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Harold Angel. (Attachments: #1 Envelope used to mail document) (AMP)
February 9, 2015 Filing 29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to nonexistent entity Centurion Managed Care by Centene Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TN Business Entity Search, #2 Exhibit MO Business Entity Search, #3 Exhibit Inmate Grievance File)(Swanson, Daniel)
February 2, 2015 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed Centene Corporation served on 1/15/2015 USM Service. (AMP)
January 29, 2015 Filing 27 Certificate of Corporate Interest by MHM Services, Inc.. (Swanson, Daniel)
January 29, 2015 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MHM Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Grievance File)(Swanson, Daniel)
January 29, 2015 Filing 25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by MHM Services, Inc.. (Swanson, Daniel)
January 29, 2015 Filing 24 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Centene Corporation. (Swanson, Daniel)
January 29, 2015 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Centene Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Grievance File)(Swanson, Daniel)
January 29, 2015 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Centene Corporation. (Swanson, Daniel)
January 29, 2015 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Clement Bernard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Grievance File)(Swanson, Daniel)
January 29, 2015 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Clement Bernard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cited Case Law)(Swanson, Daniel)
January 26, 2015 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed Centurion served on 1/12/2015 USM Service. (AMP)
January 26, 2015 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed MHM Services, Inc. served on 1/13/2015 USM Service. (AMP)
January 20, 2015 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed Chance served on 1/9/2015 USM Service. (RLC, )
January 20, 2015 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed Harold Angel served on 1/9/2015 USM Service. (RLC, )
January 20, 2015 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed Sharon C Taylor served on 1/9/2015 USM Service. (RLC, )
January 20, 2015 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed Randy Lee served on 1/9/2015 USM Service. (RLC, )
January 20, 2015 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed Clement Bernard served on 1/9/2015 USM Service. (RLC, )
January 20, 2015 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Jesse Gregg served on 1/9/2015 USM Service. (RLC, )
January 20, 2015 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Kevin Hampton served on 1/9/2015 USM Service. (RLC, )
January 20, 2015 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Misty Hardin served on 1/9/2015 USM Service. (RLC, )
December 10, 2014 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by George Joseph Raudenbush, III.(Merritt, Roy)
September 30, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE re IFP Service re #7 Summons Issued, (RLC, )
September 30, 2014 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Kevin Hampton, #2 Summons Misty Hardin, #3 Summons Harold Angel, #4 Summons Randy Lee, #5 Summons Clement Bernard, #6 Summons Jesse Gregg, #7 Summons Chance, #8 Summons Centurion, #9 Summons Centene Corporation, #10 Summons MHM Services)(RLC, )
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis H Inman on 9/30/2014. (RLC, )
September 26, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE by George Joseph Raudenbush, III re #1 Complaint,, corrected summons for sharon taylor (Merritt, Roy)
September 26, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE by George Joseph Raudenbush, III re #1 Complaint,, summons for Sharon C. Taylor (Merritt, Roy)
September 26, 2014 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by George Joseph Raudenbush, III. (Merritt, Roy)
September 26, 2014 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint : requirements due by 10/1/2014. (RLC, )
September 25, 2014 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Dennis H Inman added. (RLC, )
September 25, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by George Joseph Raudenbush, III. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis w/ Supporting Documentation, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Defendant Hardin Summons, #4 Summons Defendant Angel Summons, #5 Summons Defendant Hampton Summons, #6 Summons Defendant Taylor Summons, #7 Summons Defendant Chance Summons, #8 Summons DEfendant Gregg Summons, #9 Summons Defendant Lee Summons, #10 Summons Defendant MHM Services Summons, #11 Summons Defendant Centurion Summons, #12 Summons Defendant Centene Summons, #13 Summons DEfendant Dr. Bernard Summons)(Merritt, Roy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raudenbush, III v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Hampton
Represented By: Arthur Crownover, II
Represented By: Eric Andrew Fuller
Represented By: Jennifer L Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Misty Hardin
Represented By: Arthur Crownover, II
Represented By: Eric Andrew Fuller
Represented By: Jennifer L Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion Managed Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Systems Healthcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clement Bernard
Represented By: Kelly Scot Street
Represented By: Daniel T Swanson
Represented By: Heidi A Barcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chance
Represented By: Arthur Crownover, II
Represented By: Eric Andrew Fuller
Represented By: Jennifer L Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centene Corporation
Represented By: Kelly Scot Street
Represented By: Daniel T Swanson
Represented By: Heidi A Barcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Misty Gregg
Represented By: Arthur Crownover, II
Represented By: Eric Andrew Fuller
Represented By: Jennifer L Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Gregg
Represented By: Arthur Crownover, II
Represented By: Eric Andrew Fuller
Represented By: Jennifer L Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Lee
Represented By: Arthur Crownover, II
Represented By: Eric Andrew Fuller
Represented By: Jennifer L Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hampton
Represented By: Arthur Crownover, II
Represented By: Eric Andrew Fuller
Represented By: Jennifer L Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Scot Street
Represented By: Daniel T Swanson
Represented By: Heidi A Barcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Angel
Represented By: Arthur Crownover, II
Represented By: Eric Andrew Fuller
Represented By: Jennifer L Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon C Taylor
Represented By: Arthur Crownover, II
Represented By: Eric Andrew Fuller
Represented By: Jennifer L Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Joseph Raudenbush, III
Represented By: Kimberly H Cambron
Represented By: Roy Steve Merritt
Represented By: Keith L Edmiston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?