Reece v. Dynamic Recovery Solutions, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Annette Reece and Baird
Defendant: John Does 1-25, Cavalry SPV I, LLC and Dynamic Recovery Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00122
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Harry S Mattice
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. Magistrate Judge M Clifton L Corker no longer assigned to case pursuant to SO-19-13. (CNC)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Plaintiff has filed a Motion for admission of Yaakov Saks, Esq. pro hac vice in this action [Doc. 8]. The Motion is GRANTED. Counsel MUST register immediately as a CM/ECF user in this district. The registration form can be found at the Court's website, www.tned.uscourts.gov, under "For Attorneys" and "Electronic Case Filing".Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 08/06/2019. (CAT)
August 5, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete for Yaakov Saks regarding document: #8 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Yaakov Saks ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4039488.) filed by Annette Reece (CAT)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 Administrative Notice to Counsel #8 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Yaakov Saks ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4039488.) : INFORMATIONAL ONLY. For future reference please be sure to file documents in a "portrait" orientation. (CAT)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Yaakov Saks ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4039488.) by Annette Reece. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Saks, Yaakov)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on July 18, 2019. (AYB)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on July 18, 2019. (AYB)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on July 18, 2019. (AYB)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac): Attorney is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/docs/pro_hac_vice.pdf. (AYB)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel re: #1 Complaint: In future filings, please "flatten".pdf documents. The forms submitted were still in a fillable, "un-flattened," alterable format. (AYB)
July 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cavalry SPV I, LLC and Dynamic Recovery Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Cavalry SPV I, LLC) (AYB)
July 16, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (AYB)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cavalry SPV I, LLC, Dynamic Recovery Solutions, LLC, John Does 1-25 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4024030.), filed by Annette Reece. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Other)(Saks, Yaakov)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reece v. Dynamic Recovery Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cavalry SPV I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynamic Recovery Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Reece
Represented By: Yaakov Saks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baird
Represented By: Yaakov Saks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?