Wolfe et al v. Fontes et al
Plaintiff: Roger Wolfe and Melissa Sisk
Defendant: Armando Fontes, Bob Schaff, Josh Hartsell and Cocke County, Tennessee
Case Number: 2:2022cv00096
Filed: August 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charles E Atchley
Referring Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2023 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal Case by Melissa Sisk, Roger Wolfe. (Bowlin, Troy)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/6/2024 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Charles E Atchley Jr.. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2024 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Charles E Atchley Jr..Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on March 30, 2023. (SAC)
March 21, 2023 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ward, Jeffrey)
March 3, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Cocke County, Tennessee, Armando Fontes, Josh Hartsell, Bob Schaff (Ward, Jeffrey)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER.The parties are ORDERED to file with the Court a discovery plan no later than 21 days from the date of this Order.Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on February 28, 2023. (SAC)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 01/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/ NonConsent) (CAT)
January 16, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Cocke County, Tennessee, Armando Fontes, Josh Hartsell, Bob Schaff.(Ward, Jeffrey)
December 22, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond by Cocke County, Tennessee, Armando Fontes, Josh Hartsell, Bob Schaff. (Ward, Jeffrey)
November 18, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Roger Wolfe, Melissa Sisk. All Defendants. (Bowlin, Troy)
August 15, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Deficiency (PDF) re #1 Complaint. (CAT)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 08/15/2022. (CAT)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 08/15/2022. (CAT)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 08/15/2022. (CAT)
August 15, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cocke County, Tennessee, Armando Fontes, Josh Hartsell, Bob Schaff. (Attachments: #1 Summons Cocke County, Tennessee, #2 Summons Josh Hartsell, #3 Summons Bob Schaff)(CAT)
August 15, 2022 District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (CAT)
August 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-5140989.), filed by Estate of Kelsey Wolfe, Melissa Sisk As Administrator and Next of Kin, Roger Wolfe as Next of Kin and Administrator. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Bowlin, Troy) (Attachment 4 replaced on 8/15/2022) (CAT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolfe et al v. Fontes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Wolfe
Represented By: Troy L Bowlin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Sisk
Represented By: Troy L Bowlin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armando Fontes
Represented By: Jeffrey M Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Schaff
Represented By: Jeffrey M Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Hartsell
Represented By: Jeffrey M Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cocke County, Tennessee
Represented By: Jeffrey M Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?