Anderson et al v. Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc. (TV3)
Plaintiff: Gary Smith, Lindsey Sitzlar, Mary Smith, Mico Posey, Bryan Todd, Missie Weatherford, Sherry Choate, Brandi Cofer, John Jennings, Brenda Dyer, Amy Clabough, John Herron, Joseph Tallent, Jessie West, Ashley Webb, Matthew Clabough, Richard Johnson, Justin Sitzlar, Debbie Gunter, Michael Bernier, James Robinson, Elizabeth Sirene Workman, Ernestine Seiber, Patricia Roysden, Curtis Spradlin, Robert Brock, Julie Muse, Timothy Terry, Freddie Daniels, Robin Tallent, Betty Bylliot, Jason Webb, Carole Harwood, Sandra Ausburn, Jason Foster, Richard Harwood, Rhonda Collins, Bethany Herron, Stephen Boardman, Clous Seiber, Ronny Mitchell, James Bolling, Russell Muse, Darwin Wade Beaty, Kerri Duncan, William Hazzard, Ladena Hazzard, Steve Pettyjohn, Sherry Jimerson, Elizabeth Williams, Joseph Lowery, Pete Johsen, Timothy Greene, Kevin Stephens, Terry Lewallen, Rebecca Poindexter, Stephen Dunn, Dustin Hall, Larry Poindexter, Sherry Cofer, Janice Wenzel, Nic Woods, Michael Cofer, Joii Morgan, Glenn Cofer, James Ledbetter, Eric Bell, Kirk Wenzel, John Jones, Thelma Mitchell, Richard Choate, Justin Duncan, Tymri Bell, Samuel David Collins, April Kilby, Rebecca Bolling, Grant Bailey, Jeremy Kilby, Brenda Hendrickson, Dana Bernier, Maxwell Bylliot, Lyndsay Collins, Nancy Blevins, Millard Hendrickson, David Crowley, Daril Blevins, Linda Kitts, John Poindexter, Wendy Brook, Debbie Lecomte, Judy Metcalf, David Jones, Rachel Anderson, Samuel Smith, David Weatherford, Wade Boos, Frank Tomb, Heather Smith, Mary Davis, Heather Hall, Edwin Bledsoe, Pamela Braden, James Lecomte, Jack Kelley, Marianne Poindexter, Leroy Turner, James Anderson, Scott McCoy, David Jimerson, Tina Ledbetter, Paul Lowe, Danny Morgan, William Bradshaw Workman, Michelle Bailey, Patricia Crowley, Russell Morgan, Kathy Tomb, Robin Greene, Joseph Rood, Tiffany Posey, Rachael Anderson, Jesse West and Robert Muse
Defendant: Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00219
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by James Anderson (Stewart, Keith)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 Plaintiffs' Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Briefing Schedule Deadlines with Respect to #8 #10 Pending Motions to Dismiss by James Anderson. (Stewart, Keith) Modified text on 7/23/2019 (AYB).
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 07/19/2019. (JTS)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on July 12, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AYB)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #9 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Declaration of Jeremy S. Smith, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q)(Tarwater, Dwight)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (Tarwater, Dwight)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (Tarwater, Dwight)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER finding this case is related to Greg Adkisson, et al. v. Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc., No. 3:13-CV-505. The Court finds that these cases arise out of the same transaction or occurrence and involve one or more of the same parties. Therefore, the two cases are related. Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge Thomas A. Varlan and Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton, this case will also be assigned to District Judge Thomas A. Varlan and Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton. However, consolidation is not ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on June 20, 2019. (AYB)
June 20, 2019 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (AYB)
June 18, 2019 Case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Guyton for related case determination. (AMP)
June 18, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy Smith ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3999938.) filed by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc., and #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Theane Evangelis ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3999918.) filed by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc. (AMP)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Notice of Removal: No action to be taken. Informational Only. For future reference: please comply with ECF Rule 6regarding signature and ECF login; file the civil cover sheet in a nonfillableform; and file the Corporate Disclosure Statement separate using the eventCertificate of Corporate Interest under Other Documents. (AMP)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 Administrative Notice to Counsel: Attorney Thomas Jarvis is not registered for CM/ECF. Requirements due by 6/24/2019. (Copy of Notice mailed to Thomas Jarvis) (AMP)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (Tarwater, Dwight)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy Smith ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3999938.) by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing-Smith)(Tarwater, Dwight)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Theane Evangelis ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3999918.) by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing-Evangelis)(Tarwater, Dwight)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Roane County Circuit Court, case number 2019-CV-81. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3998826), filed by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Other Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Other Corporate Disclosure)(Doolittle, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson et al v. Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc. (TV3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Smith
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Sitzlar
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Smith
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mico Posey
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Todd
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missie Weatherford
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Choate
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Cofer
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Jennings
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Dyer
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Clabough
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Herron
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Tallent
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Webb
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Clabough
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Johnson
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Sitzlar
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Gunter
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bernier
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Robinson
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Sirene Workman
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernestine Seiber
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Roysden
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Spradlin
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Brock
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Muse
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Terry
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Daniels
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Tallent
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Bylliot
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Webb
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole Harwood
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Ausburn
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Foster
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Harwood
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Collins
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethany Herron
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Boardman
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clous Seiber
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronny Mitchell
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bolling
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Muse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darwin Wade Beaty
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerri Duncan
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hazzard
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ladena Hazzard
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Pettyjohn
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Jimerson
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Williams
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lowery
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pete Johsen
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Greene
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Stephens
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Lewallen
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Poindexter
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Dunn
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Hall
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Poindexter
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Cofer
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Wenzel
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nic Woods
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cofer
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joii Morgan
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Cofer
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ledbetter
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bell
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Wenzel
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Jones
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelma Mitchell
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Choate
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Duncan
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tymri Bell
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel David Collins
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Kilby
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Bolling
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant Bailey
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Kilby
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Hendrickson
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Bernier
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxwell Bylliot
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyndsay Collins
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Blevins
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millard Hendrickson
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Crowley
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daril Blevins
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Kitts
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Poindexter
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Brook
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Lecomte
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Metcalf
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Jones
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Smith
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Weatherford
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade Boos
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Tomb
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Smith
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Davis
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Hall
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Bledsoe
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Braden
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lecomte
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Kelley
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianne Poindexter
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Turner
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Anderson
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott McCoy
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Jimerson
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Ledbetter
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Lowe
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Morgan
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bradshaw Workman
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Bailey
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Crowley
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Morgan
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Tomb
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Greene
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Rood
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Posey
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachael Anderson
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse West
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Muse
Represented By: John B Dupree
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.
Represented By: Barbara K Doolittle
Represented By: Jeremy S Smith
Represented By: Theane Evangelis
Represented By: Catherine Williams Anglin
Represented By: Dwight E Tarwater
Represented By: Thomas Howard Jarvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?