Mills v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Avis D Mills
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S.Atty- Knoxville and United States Attorney General
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2019cv00239
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Avis D Mills. U.S.Atty- Knoxville served on 7/17/2019. (Miller, Kenneth)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Avis D Mills. United States Attorney General served on 7/24/2019. (Miller, Kenneth)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Avis D Mills. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 7/23/2019. (Miller, Kenneth)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE re IFP Service for #4 Summons Issued (AYB)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons Social Security Administrator, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney General) (AYB)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on July 15, 2019. (AYB)
July 1, 2019 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (AMP)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Avis D Mills. (Miller, Kenneth)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Avis D Mills. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Kansas City, #3 Summons Washington DC, #4 Knoxville)(Miller, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mills v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S.Atty- Knoxville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avis D Mills
Represented By: Kenneth A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?