Russell et al v. Russell et al
Plaintiff: Noel L Russell, Dana M Russell, Dana Russell and Noel Russell
Defendant: Tina M Russell, Kenneth L Burgett, Tina Russell and Kenneth Lee Burgett
Case Number: 3:2019cv00339
Filed: August 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case with prejudice by Dana Russell, Noel Russell (Fox, W)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT Civil Cover Sheet by Dana Russell, Noel Russell. (Fox, W)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/3/2019. (JCK)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/3/2019. (JCK)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions, Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/3/2019. (JCK)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kenneth Lee Burgett, Tina Russell. (Attachments: #1 Summons Kenneth Lee Burgett)(JCK)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint. No Civil Cover Sheet filed. Please file a completed Civil Cover Sheet using the event Supplement found under the category Other Documents. Requirements due by 9/9/2019. (JCK)
September 3, 2019 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (JCK)
August 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Wiretapping Violation against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4067606.), filed by Noel L Russell, Dana M Russell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Collective Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Collective Ex. B, #3 Summons Tina Russell Summons, #4 Summons Kenneth Lee Burgett Summons)(Fox, W)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell et al v. Russell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel L Russell
Represented By: W Andrew Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana M Russell
Represented By: W Andrew Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Russell
Represented By: W Andrew Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel Russell
Represented By: W Andrew Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina M Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth L Burgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Lee Burgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?