Abbott et al v. United States of America (JRG1)
Plaintiff: Jody T. Bertram, Kelsey Y. Chambers, Larry D. Raymes, James Tom Shofner, Douglas E. Moore, Charles Cavanaugh, Kerry "Tom" Sanders, Kirk L. Heinsohn, Connie R. Springfield, Victoria D. Fister, Stephanie R. Greico, James M. Hunter, Brian H. Alspach, Mark Hass, MSM Capital Management, LLP, Jones and Butler Investments, LLC, Terrell M. Bouie, Julie O. Yates, Jennifer L. Kaylor, Jacqueline Waddle, Sandra M. Fratini, Jayme E. Aleman, Sandra Rovhana-Lollino, Edgar C. McKinney, Dora Jean Paulk, Michael Bech, Mack Newman Butler, Linda F. Klassen, Glen Beasley, Denise A. Naquin, Amy E. Dowling, Joann K. Tant, Carol A. Daniel, Douglas S. Yates, Betty J. Parton, James D. Holifield, Delbert R. Wallace, Richard I. Kimner, Sue D. Thompson, Terri Hass, Raymond A. Waddle, Jr., Lois A. Eames, Carroll E. Nichols, Connie Panelle Butler, Karen Raymes, Harry R. Holding, Tomeika C. Stallworth, Amanda L. Wory, Katrina L. Pittman, Steve W. Cofield, Joseph Fratini, Claude Thomas, John H.H. Matthews, Patrick McKnight, Eve O. Buero, Linda K. Garrett, Betsy C. Rettig, Anthony L. Yates, Timothy Fannin, Audrey Yates, Kyle S. King, Deborah L. Young, Merry D. Dumas, Lauren J. Meier, Mary Lisa Tant Campbell, Tina K. Hosse, Brandi M. Holifield, David R. Cheatham, Brenda J. Halsey, Carol G. Muszik, Thomas R. Wory, Lindsey Campbell, Joshua Yates, Leon C. Dodd, Karen N. Leverette, Russell E. Haskins, Caleb B. Chase, Don J. Dowling, Jacob W. Parton, David L. Naquin, Sr., David M. Klassen, Tammy F. Bain, Timothy James Easley, Michael B. Thompson, Paul Cliff Price, Jo Rita Maxwell, Barry S. Springfield, Zina Faye McKinney, Marvis L. Bosarge Gonzalez, Tommy L. Starkey, Keith M. Flannery, John C. Kling, Karen M. Holding, Phyllis J. Seidel, Stephen R. Gilmore, Destin R. Chambers, Tammie R. Starkey, Anthony F. Merck, Jaqueline R. Robertson, Michael G. Thompson, Denise M. Sanders, Judy A. Sullivan, Mark Rueter, Amanda B. Perryman, Roy F. Merck, Kathy Jones, Daniell L. Greer, Mary E. Puhala, Dave Hisey, Giselle Porraspita, Deborah A. Brooks, Sharon H. Hirschfield, Toni L. Abbott, Lynn M. Collins, Joel A. Sortore, Terry D. Daniel, Kenneth M. Matthews, Charles C. Young, John R. Leverette, Darlene R. Verito, Karen McKnight, Miranda L. Paulk, Gae Campbell, Myrl D. Carr, Cheryl A. Kling, Charlie Bob Hughes, Jr., Wesley M. Pittman, John P. Eames, Rita S. Montero, Jan Cofield, Cheryl A. Shofner, David L. Joyner, Cheryl F. Haskins, Gerald Sullivan, Brittany N. Adkins, Deborah L. Gilmore, Ronald R. Whisnant, Jr., Genie E. Brabham, Arthur W. Stewart, James L. Halsey, Stephen E. Bond, Justin W. Dumas, Leslie N. Miles, Krista Yates, John L. Hondulas, Charles M. Nichols, III, Brooke A. Kratchoff, Paul W. Abbott, Owen G. Smith, Julie Lynn Chase, James Dale Grace Christian Trust, Sandy M. Moore, Sandra M. Bech, Christopher Dunaway, Elizabeth A. Smith, Rick Cook, Doreen R. King, Damon J. Matthews, Sue Naquin, Bret M. Greer, Florian J. Puhala, Jr. and Stephen C. Hosse
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv00149
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. The public may listen to the video hearing in the above captioned case scheduled for May 28, 2020, at 10:00 a.m., by calling (877) 3361839 and using the access code 1607009. Only audio will be available to the public.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 5/26/20. (KSH)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The Court hereby notifies the parties that the in-person hearing scheduled for May 20, 2020 is canceled. Instead, the hearing will be held via video conference on May 28, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. EST. The United States is ordered to select one or two attorneys to make arguments on its behalf. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 4/28/2020. (JCK)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paul Stephan. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 04/22/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Paul Stephan) (CAT)
April 22, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding #13 MOTION for Paul M. Stephan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (AYB)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Theodore Leopold; granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Leslie Kroeger and; granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Adam Langino. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 04/21/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Adam Langino) (AMP)
April 21, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Paul M. Stephan ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4313849.) by Bret M. Greer, Daniell L. Greer, Stephanie R. Greico, Brenda J. Halsey, James L. Halsey, Cheryl F. Haskins, Russell E. Haskins, Mark Hass, Terri Hass, Kirk L. Heinsohn, Sharon H. Hirschfield, Dave Hisey, Karen M. Holding, Harry R. Holding, James D. Holifield, Brandi M. Holifield, John L. Hondulas, Stephen C. Hosse, Tina K. Hosse, Charlie Bob Hughes, Jr, James M. Hunter, James Dale Grace Christian Trust, Kathy Jones, Jones and Butler Investments, LLC, David L. Joyner, Jennifer L. Kaylor (Next of Friend of), Jennifer L. Kaylor, Richard I. Kimner, Doreen R. King, Kyle S. King, David M. Klassen, Linda F. Klassen, Cheryl A. Kling, John C. Kling, Brooke A. Kratchoff, John R. Leverette, Karen N. Leverette, MSM Capital Management, LLP, Damon J. Matthews, Kenneth M. Matthews, John H.H. Matthews, Jo Rita Maxwell, Edgar C. McKinney, Zina Faye McKinney, Karen McKnight, Patrick McKnight, Lauren J. Meier, Anthony F. Merck, Roy F. Merck, Darlene R. Verito, Jacqueline Waddle, Raymond A. Waddle, Jr, Delbert R. Wallace, Ronald R. Whisnant, Jr, Amanda L. Wory, Thomas R. Wory, Anthony L. Yates, Audrey Yates, Douglas S. Yates, Joshua Yates, Julie O. Yates, Krista Yates, Charles C. Young, Deborah L. Young, Leslie N. Miles, Rita S. Montero, Douglas E. Moore, Sandy M. Moore, Carol G. Muszik, David L. Naquin, Sr, Denise A. Naquin, Sue Naquin, Carroll E. Nichols, Charles M. Nichols, III, Betty J. Parton, Jacob W. Parton, Miranda L. Paulk, Dora Jean Paulk, Amanda B. Perryman, Katrina L. Pittman, Wesley M. Pittman, Giselle Porraspita, Paul Cliff Price, Florian J. Puhala, Jr, Mary E. Puhala, Karen Raymes, Larry D. Raymes, Betsy C. Rettig, Jaqueline R. Robertson, Sandra Rovhana-Lollino, Mark Rueter, Denise M. Sanders, Kerry "Tom" Sanders, Phyllis J. Seidel, Cheryl A. Shofner, James Tom Shofner, Elizabeth A. Smith, Owen G. Smith, Joel A. Sortore, Connie R. Springfield, Barry S. Springfield, Tomeika C. Stallworth, Tammie R. Starkey, Tommy L. Starkey, Arthur W. Stewart, Gerald Sullivan, Judy A. Sullivan, Joann K. Tant, Mary Lisa Tant Campbell, Claude Thomas, Michael B. Thompson, Michael G. Thompson, Sue D. Thompson, Paul W. Abbott, Toni L. Abbott, Brittany N. Adkins, Jayme E. Aleman, Brian H. Alspach, Tammy F. Bain, Glen Beasley, Michael Bech, Sandra M. Bech, Jody T. Bertram, Stephen E. Bond, Marvis L. Bosarge Gonzalez, Terrell M. Bouie, Genie E. Brabham, Deborah A. Brooks, Eve O. Buero, Connie Panelle Butler, Mack Newman Butler, Gae Campbell, Lindsey Campbell, Myrl D. Carr, Charles Cavanaugh, Destin R. Chambers, Kelsey Y. Chambers, Caleb B. Chase, Julie Lynn Chase, David R. Cheatham, Jan Cofield, Steve W. Cofield, Lynn M. Collins, Rick Cook, Carol A. Daniel, Terry D. Daniel, Leon C. Dodd, Amy E. Dowling, Don J. Dowling, Justin W. Dumas, Merry D. Dumas, Christopher Dunaway, John P. Eames, Lois A. Eames, Timothy James Easley, Timothy Fannin, Victoria D. Fister, Keith M. Flannery, Joseph Fratini, Sandra M. Fratini, Linda K. Garrett, Deborah L. Gilmore, Stephen R. Gilmore. (Gilreath, Sidney)
April 21, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Adam Langino ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4312353.) and #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Leslie Kroeger ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4312332.) The certificate of good standings are older than 30 days, however a check of the Florida Bar finds no disciplinary actions (JBR)
April 20, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding #10 MOTION for Theodore Leopold to Appear Pro Hac Vice; the certificate of good standing is beyond 30 days old, however a check of the website for the Florida Bar shows no disciplinary actions (AYB)
April 20, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Adam Langino ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4312353.) by Bret M. Greer, Daniell L. Greer, Stephanie R. Greico, Brenda J. Halsey, James L. Halsey, Cheryl F. Haskins, Russell E. Haskins, Mark Hass, Terri Hass, Kirk L. Heinsohn, Sharon H. Hirschfield, Dave Hisey, Karen M. Holding, Harry R. Holding, James D. Holifield, Brandi M. Holifield, John L. Hondulas, Stephen C. Hosse, Tina K. Hosse, Charlie Bob Hughes, Jr, James M. Hunter, James Dale Grace Christian Trust, Kathy Jones, Jones and Butler Investments, LLC, David L. Joyner, Jennifer L. Kaylor (Next of Friend of), Jennifer L. Kaylor, Richard I. Kimner, Doreen R. King, Kyle S. King, David M. Klassen, Linda F. Klassen, Cheryl A. Kling, John C. Kling, Brooke A. Kratchoff, John R. Leverette, Karen N. Leverette, MSM Capital Management, LLP, Damon J. Matthews, Kenneth M. Matthews, John H.H. Matthews, Jo Rita Maxwell, Edgar C. McKinney, Zina Faye McKinney, Karen McKnight, Patrick McKnight, Lauren J. Meier, Anthony F. Merck, Roy F. Merck, Darlene R. Verito, Jacqueline Waddle, Raymond A. Waddle, Jr, Delbert R. Wallace, Ronald R. Whisnant, Jr, Amanda L. Wory, Thomas R. Wory, Anthony L. Yates, Audrey Yates, Douglas S. Yates, Joshua Yates, Julie O. Yates, Krista Yates, Charles C. Young, Deborah L. Young, Leslie N. Miles, Rita S. Montero, Douglas E. Moore, Sandy M. Moore, Carol G. Muszik, David L. Naquin, Sr, Denise A. Naquin, Sue Naquin, Carroll E. Nichols, Charles M. Nichols, III, Betty J. Parton, Jacob W. Parton, Miranda L. Paulk, Dora Jean Paulk, Amanda B. Perryman, Katrina L. Pittman, Wesley M. Pittman, Giselle Porraspita, Paul Cliff Price, Florian J. Puhala, Jr, Mary E. Puhala, Karen Raymes, Larry D. Raymes, Betsy C. Rettig, Jaqueline R. Robertson, Sandra Rovhana-Lollino, Mark Rueter, Denise M. Sanders, Kerry "Tom" Sanders, Phyllis J. Seidel, Cheryl A. Shofner, James Tom Shofner, Elizabeth A. Smith, Owen G. Smith, Joel A. Sortore, Connie R. Springfield, Barry S. Springfield, Tomeika C. Stallworth, Tammie R. Starkey, Tommy L. Starkey, Arthur W. Stewart, Gerald Sullivan, Judy A. Sullivan, Joann K. Tant, Mary Lisa Tant Campbell, Claude Thomas, Michael B. Thompson, Michael G. Thompson, Sue D. Thompson, Paul W. Abbott, Toni L. Abbott, Brittany N. Adkins, Jayme E. Aleman, Brian H. Alspach, Tammy F. Bain, Glen Beasley, Michael Bech, Sandra M. Bech, Jody T. Bertram, Stephen E. Bond, Marvis L. Bosarge Gonzalez, Terrell M. Bouie, Genie E. Brabham, Deborah A. Brooks, Eve O. Buero, Connie Panelle Butler, Mack Newman Butler, Gae Campbell, Lindsey Campbell, Myrl D. Carr, Charles Cavanaugh, Destin R. Chambers, Kelsey Y. Chambers, Caleb B. Chase, Julie Lynn Chase, David R. Cheatham, Jan Cofield, Steve W. Cofield, Lynn M. Collins, Rick Cook, Carol A. Daniel, Terry D. Daniel, Leon C. Dodd, Amy E. Dowling, Don J. Dowling, Justin W. Dumas, Merry D. Dumas, Christopher Dunaway, John P. Eames, Lois A. Eames, Timothy James Easley, Timothy Fannin, Victoria D. Fister, Keith M. Flannery, Joseph Fratini, Sandra M. Fratini, Linda K. Garrett, Deborah L. Gilmore, Stephen R. Gilmore. (Gilreath, Sidney)
April 20, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Leslie Kroeger ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4312332.) by Bret M. Greer, Daniell L. Greer, Stephanie R. Greico, Brenda J. Halsey, James L. Halsey, Cheryl F. Haskins, Russell E. Haskins, Mark Hass, Terri Hass, Kirk L. Heinsohn, Sharon H. Hirschfield, Dave Hisey, Karen M. Holding, Harry R. Holding, James D. Holifield, Brandi M. Holifield, John L. Hondulas, Stephen C. Hosse, Tina K. Hosse, Charlie Bob Hughes, Jr, James M. Hunter, James Dale Grace Christian Trust, Kathy Jones, Jones and Butler Investments, LLC, David L. Joyner, Jennifer L. Kaylor (Next of Friend of), Jennifer L. Kaylor, Richard I. Kimner, Doreen R. King, Kyle S. King, David M. Klassen, Linda F. Klassen, Cheryl A. Kling, John C. Kling, Brooke A. Kratchoff, John R. Leverette, Karen N. Leverette, MSM Capital Management, LLP, Damon J. Matthews, Kenneth M. Matthews, John H.H. Matthews, Jo Rita Maxwell, Edgar C. McKinney, Zina Faye McKinney, Karen McKnight, Patrick McKnight, Lauren J. Meier, Anthony F. Merck, Roy F. Merck, Darlene R. Verito, Jacqueline Waddle, Raymond A. Waddle, Jr, Delbert R. Wallace, Ronald R. Whisnant, Jr, Amanda L. Wory, Thomas R. Wory, Anthony L. Yates, Audrey Yates, Douglas S. Yates, Joshua Yates, Julie O. Yates, Krista Yates, Charles C. Young, Deborah L. Young, Leslie N. Miles, Rita S. Montero, Douglas E. Moore, Sandy M. Moore, Carol G. Muszik, David L. Naquin, Sr, Denise A. Naquin, Sue Naquin, Carroll E. Nichols, Charles M. Nichols, III, Betty J. Parton, Jacob W. Parton, Miranda L. Paulk, Dora Jean Paulk, Amanda B. Perryman, Katrina L. Pittman, Wesley M. Pittman, Giselle Porraspita, Paul Cliff Price, Florian J. Puhala, Jr, Mary E. Puhala, Karen Raymes, Larry D. Raymes, Betsy C. Rettig, Jaqueline R. Robertson, Sandra Rovhana-Lollino, Mark Rueter, Denise M. Sanders, Kerry "Tom" Sanders, Phyllis J. Seidel, Cheryl A. Shofner, James Tom Shofner, Elizabeth A. Smith, Owen G. Smith, Joel A. Sortore, Connie R. Springfield, Barry S. Springfield, Tomeika C. Stallworth, Tammie R. Starkey, Tommy L. Starkey, Arthur W. Stewart, Gerald Sullivan, Judy A. Sullivan, Joann K. Tant, Mary Lisa Tant Campbell, Claude Thomas, Michael B. Thompson, Michael G. Thompson, Sue D. Thompson, Paul W. Abbott, Toni L. Abbott, Brittany N. Adkins, Jayme E. Aleman, Brian H. Alspach, Tammy F. Bain, Glen Beasley, Michael Bech, Sandra M. Bech, Jody T. Bertram, Stephen E. Bond, Marvis L. Bosarge Gonzalez, Terrell M. Bouie, Genie E. Brabham, Deborah A. Brooks, Eve O. Buero, Connie Panelle Butler, Mack Newman Butler, Gae Campbell, Lindsey Campbell, Myrl D. Carr, Charles Cavanaugh, Destin R. Chambers, Kelsey Y. Chambers, Caleb B. Chase, Julie Lynn Chase, David R. Cheatham, Jan Cofield, Steve W. Cofield, Lynn M. Collins, Rick Cook, Carol A. Daniel, Terry D. Daniel, Leon C. Dodd, Amy E. Dowling, Don J. Dowling, Justin W. Dumas, Merry D. Dumas, Christopher Dunaway, John P. Eames, Lois A. Eames, Timothy James Easley, Timothy Fannin, Victoria D. Fister, Keith M. Flannery, Joseph Fratini, Sandra M. Fratini, Linda K. Garrett, Deborah L. Gilmore, Stephen R. Gilmore. (Gilreath, Sidney)
April 20, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Theodore Leopold ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4312314.) by Bret M. Greer, Daniell L. Greer, Stephanie R. Greico, Brenda J. Halsey, James L. Halsey, Cheryl F. Haskins, Russell E. Haskins, Mark Hass, Terri Hass, Kirk L. Heinsohn, Sharon H. Hirschfield, Dave Hisey, Karen M. Holding, Harry R. Holding, James D. Holifield, Brandi M. Holifield, John L. Hondulas, Stephen C. Hosse, Tina K. Hosse, Charlie Bob Hughes, Jr, James M. Hunter, James Dale Grace Christian Trust, Kathy Jones, Jones and Butler Investments, LLC, David L. Joyner, Jennifer L. Kaylor (Next of Friend of), Jennifer L. Kaylor, Richard I. Kimner, Doreen R. King, Kyle S. King, David M. Klassen, Linda F. Klassen, Cheryl A. Kling, John C. Kling, Brooke A. Kratchoff, John R. Leverette, Karen N. Leverette, MSM Capital Management, LLP, Damon J. Matthews, Kenneth M. Matthews, John H.H. Matthews, Jo Rita Maxwell, Edgar C. McKinney, Zina Faye McKinney, Karen McKnight, Patrick McKnight, Lauren J. Meier, Anthony F. Merck, Roy F. Merck, Darlene R. Verito, Jacqueline Waddle, Raymond A. Waddle, Jr, Delbert R. Wallace, Ronald R. Whisnant, Jr, Amanda L. Wory, Thomas R. Wory, Anthony L. Yates, Audrey Yates, Douglas S. Yates, Joshua Yates, Julie O. Yates, Krista Yates, Charles C. Young, Deborah L. Young, Leslie N. Miles, Rita S. Montero, Douglas E. Moore, Sandy M. Moore, Carol G. Muszik, David L. Naquin, Sr, Denise A. Naquin, Sue Naquin, Carroll E. Nichols, Charles M. Nichols, III, Betty J. Parton, Jacob W. Parton, Miranda L. Paulk, Dora Jean Paulk, Amanda B. Perryman, Katrina L. Pittman, Wesley M. Pittman, Giselle Porraspita, Paul Cliff Price, Florian J. Puhala, Jr, Mary E. Puhala, Karen Raymes, Larry D. Raymes, Betsy C. Rettig, Jaqueline R. Robertson, Sandra Rovhana-Lollino, Mark Rueter, Denise M. Sanders, Kerry "Tom" Sanders, Phyllis J. Seidel, Cheryl A. Shofner, James Tom Shofner, Elizabeth A. Smith, Owen G. Smith, Joel A. Sortore, Connie R. Springfield, Barry S. Springfield, Tomeika C. Stallworth, Tammie R. Starkey, Tommy L. Starkey, Arthur W. Stewart, Gerald Sullivan, Judy A. Sullivan, Joann K. Tant, Mary Lisa Tant Campbell, Claude Thomas, Michael B. Thompson, Michael G. Thompson, Sue D. Thompson, Paul W. Abbott, Toni L. Abbott, Brittany N. Adkins, Jayme E. Aleman, Brian H. Alspach, Tammy F. Bain, Glen Beasley, Michael Bech, Sandra M. Bech, Jody T. Bertram, Stephen E. Bond, Marvis L. Bosarge Gonzalez, Terrell M. Bouie, Genie E. Brabham, Deborah A. Brooks, Eve O. Buero, Connie Panelle Butler, Mack Newman Butler, Gae Campbell, Lindsey Campbell, Myrl D. Carr, Charles Cavanaugh, Destin R. Chambers, Kelsey Y. Chambers, Caleb B. Chase, Julie Lynn Chase, David R. Cheatham, Jan Cofield, Steve W. Cofield, Lynn M. Collins, Rick Cook, Carol A. Daniel, Terry D. Daniel, Leon C. Dodd, Amy E. Dowling, Don J. Dowling, Justin W. Dumas, Merry D. Dumas, Christopher Dunaway, John P. Eames, Lois A. Eames, Timothy James Easley, Timothy Fannin, Victoria D. Fister, Keith M. Flannery, Joseph Fratini, Sandra M. Fratini, Linda K. Garrett, Deborah L. Gilmore, Stephen R. Gilmore. (Gilreath, Sidney)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 04/10/2020. (CAT)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 04/10/2020. (CAT)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 04/10/2020. (CAT)
April 9, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Corporate Interest by MSM Capital Management, LLP. (Gilreath, Sidney)
April 9, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Jones and Butler Investments, LLC. (Gilreath, Sidney)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court finds that the two cases are related as defined in Local Rule 3.2(d)(3)(A) because the cases arise out of the same occurrence and involve one or more of the same parties. Because Case No. 3:18-CV-201 was assigned to District Judge J. Ronnie Greer and the undersigned as Magistrate Judge, this case should be likewise assigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 04/09/2020. (CAT)
April 9, 2020 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (CAT)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney General) (CAT)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney Theodore J. Leopold is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (CAT)
April 8, 2020 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Jones and Butler Investments, LLC,and MSM Capital Management, LLP. (CAT)
April 8, 2020 Case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Wyrick for related case determination. (CAT)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4298707.), filed by Beasley Glen, Bret M. Greer, Daniell L. Greer, Stephanie R. Greico, Brenda J. Halsey, James L. Halsey, Cheryl F. Haskins, Russell E. Haskins, Mark Hass, Terri Hass, Kirk L. Heinsohn, Sharon H. Hirschfield, Dave Hisey, Karen M. Holding, Harry R. Holding, James D. Holifield, Brandi M. Holifield, John L. Hondulas, Stephen C. Hosse, Tina K. Hosse, Charlie Bob Hughes, Jr, James M. Hunter, James Dale Grace Christian Trust, Kathy Jones, Jones and Butler Investments, LLC, David L. Joyner, Jennifer L. Kaylor, Richard I. Kimner, Doreen R. King, Kyle S. King, David M. Klassen, Linda F. Klassen, Cheryl A. Kling, John C. Kling, Brooke A. Kratchoff, John R. Leverette, Karen N. Leverette, MSM Capital Management, LLP, Damon J. Matthews, Kenneth M. Matthews, John H.H. Matthews, Jo Rita Maxwell, Edgar C. McKinney, Zina Faye McKinney, Karen McKnight, Patrick McKnight, Lauren J. Meier, Anthony F. Merck, Roy F. Merck, Leslie N. Miles, Rita S. Montero, Douglas E. Moore, Sandy M. Moore, Mountainside Rentals, Carol G. Muszik, David L. Naquin, Sr, Denise A. Naquin, Sue Naquin, Carroll E. Nichols, Charles M. Nichols, III, Betty J. Parton, Jacob W. Parton, Miranda L. Paulk, Dora Jean Paulk, Amanda B. Perryman, Katrina L. Pittman, Wesley M. Pittman, Giselle Porraspita, Paul Cliff Price, Florian J. Puhala, Jr, Mary E. Puhala, Karen Raymes, Larry D. Raymes, Betsy C. Rettig, Jaqueline R. Robertson, Sandra Rovhana-Lollino, Mark Rueter, Denise M. Sanders, Kerry "Tom" Sanders, Phyllis J. Seidel, Cheryl A. Shofner, James Tom Shofner, Elizabeth A. Smith, Owen G. Smith, Joel A. Sortore, Connie R. Springfield, Barry S. Springfield, Tomeika C. Stallworth, Tammie R. Starkey, Tommy L. Starkey, Arthur W. Stewart, Gerald Sullivan, Judy A. Sullivan, Joann K. Tant, Mary Lisa Tant Campbell, Claude Thomas, Michael B. Thompson, Michael G. Thompson, Sue D. Thompson, Paul W. Abbott, Toni L. Abbott, Brittany N. Adkins, Jayme E. Aleman, Brian H. Alspach, Tammy F. Bain, Michael Bech, Sandra M. Bech, Jody T. Bertram, Stephen E. Bond, Marvis L. Bosarge Gonzalez, Terrell M. Bouie, Genie E. Brabham, Deborah A. Brooks, Eve O. Buero, Connie Panelle Butler, Mark Newman Butler, Gae Campbell, Lindsey Campbell, Myrl D. Carr, Myrl J. Carr, Charles Cavanaugh, Destin R. Chambers, Kelsey Y. Chambers, Caleb B. Chase, Julie Lynn Chase, David R. Cheatham, Jan Cofield, Steve W. Cofield, Lynn M. Collins, Rick Cook, Carol A. Daniel, Terry D. Daniel, Leon C. Dodd, Amy E. Dowling, Don J. Dowling, Justin W. Dumas, Merry D. Dumas, Christopher Dunaway, Lois A. Eames, John P. Eams, Timothy James Easley, Timothy Fannin, Victoria D. Fister, Keith M. Flannery, Joseph Fratini, Sandra M. Fratini, Linda K. Garrett, Deborah L. Gilmore, Stephen R. Gilmore, Darlene R. Verito, Jacqueline Waddle, Raymond A. Waddle, Jr, Delbert R. Wallace, Ronald R. Whisnant, Jr, Amanda L. Wory, Thomas R. Wory, Anthony L. Yates, Audrey Yates, Douglas S. Yates, Joshua Yates, Julie O. Yates, Krista Yates, Isebella A. Yeagy, Charles C. Young, Deborah L. Young. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover, #2 Summons Overby Summons, #3 Summons Barr Summons, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Gilreath, Sidney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abbott et al v. United States of America (JRG1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody T. Bertram
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsey Y. Chambers
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry D. Raymes
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Tom Shofner
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas E. Moore
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Cavanaugh
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry "Tom" Sanders
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk L. Heinsohn
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie R. Springfield
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria D. Fister
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie R. Greico
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M. Hunter
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian H. Alspach
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hass
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSM Capital Management, LLP
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jones and Butler Investments, LLC
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrell M. Bouie
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie O. Yates
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer L. Kaylor
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Waddle
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra M. Fratini
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayme E. Aleman
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Rovhana-Lollino
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar C. McKinney
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dora Jean Paulk
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bech
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mack Newman Butler
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda F. Klassen
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Beasley
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise A. Naquin
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy E. Dowling
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann K. Tant
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol A. Daniel
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas S. Yates
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty J. Parton
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James D. Holifield
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delbert R. Wallace
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard I. Kimner
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue D. Thompson
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Hass
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond A. Waddle, Jr.
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois A. Eames
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carroll E. Nichols
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Panelle Butler
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Raymes
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry R. Holding
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomeika C. Stallworth
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda L. Wory
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina L. Pittman
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve W. Cofield
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Fratini
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude Thomas
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John H.H. Matthews
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick McKnight
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eve O. Buero
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda K. Garrett
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betsy C. Rettig
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony L. Yates
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Fannin
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Yates
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle S. King
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah L. Young
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merry D. Dumas
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren J. Meier
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lisa Tant Campbell
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina K. Hosse
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi M. Holifield
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David R. Cheatham
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda J. Halsey
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol G. Muszik
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas R. Wory
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Campbell
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Yates
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon C. Dodd
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen N. Leverette
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell E. Haskins
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caleb B. Chase
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don J. Dowling
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob W. Parton
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Naquin, Sr.
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M. Klassen
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy F. Bain
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy James Easley
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael B. Thompson
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Cliff Price
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo Rita Maxwell
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry S. Springfield
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zina Faye McKinney
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvis L. Bosarge Gonzalez
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy L. Starkey
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith M. Flannery
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C. Kling
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen M. Holding
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis J. Seidel
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen R. Gilmore
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Destin R. Chambers
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammie R. Starkey
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony F. Merck
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaqueline R. Robertson
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael G. Thompson
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise M. Sanders
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy A. Sullivan
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Rueter
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda B. Perryman
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy F. Merck
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Jones
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniell L. Greer
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary E. Puhala
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Hisey
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giselle Porraspita
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah A. Brooks
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon H. Hirschfield
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni L. Abbott
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn M. Collins
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel A. Sortore
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry D. Daniel
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth M. Matthews
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles C. Young
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R. Leverette
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene R. Verito
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen McKnight
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miranda L. Paulk
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gae Campbell
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrl D. Carr
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl A. Kling
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Bob Hughes, Jr.
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley M. Pittman
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P. Eames
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita S. Montero
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Cofield
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl A. Shofner
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Joyner
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl F. Haskins
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Sullivan
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany N. Adkins
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah L. Gilmore
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald R. Whisnant, Jr.
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genie E. Brabham
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur W. Stewart
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L. Halsey
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen E. Bond
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin W. Dumas
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie N. Miles
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krista Yates
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John L. Hondulas
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles M. Nichols, III
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke A. Kratchoff
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul W. Abbott
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owen G. Smith
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Lynn Chase
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Dale Grace Christian Trust
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy M. Moore
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra M. Bech
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Dunaway
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A. Smith
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Cook
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doreen R. King
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon J. Matthews
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Naquin
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bret M. Greer
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florian J. Puhala, Jr.
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen C. Hosse
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Leslie M Kroeger
Represented By: Adam J Langino
Represented By: Paul M. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?